EP1483904 - OPTICAL IMAGE RECORDING AND IMAGE EVALUATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.05.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Zeiss AG 73446 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states Carl Zeiss AG 73446 Oberkochen / DE | ||
Former [2004/50] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
LI
Carl Zeiss D-89520 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | ||
For:GB
CARL ZEISS-STIFTUNG HANDELND ALS CARL ZEISS D-89518 Heidenheim (Brenz) / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAVIDOVICI, Dan Sonnenhang 6 85276 Pfaffenhofen a.d.Ilm / DE | [2004/50] | Representative(s) | Gnatzig, Klaus, et al Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/50] | Gnatzig, Klaus, et al Carl Zeiss Patentabteilung 73446 Oberkochen / DE | Application number, filing date | 03743811.6 | 20.02.2003 | [2004/50] | WO2003EP01702 | Priority number, date | DE2002110831 | 12.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10210831 | [2004/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03077537 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1483904 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1483904 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/247, G02B21/36 | [2004/50] | CPC: |
G02B21/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/29] |
Former [2004/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | OPTISCHES BILDAUFNAHME- UND BILDAUSWERTESYSTEM | [2004/50] | English: | OPTICAL IMAGE RECORDING AND IMAGE EVALUATING SYSTEM | [2004/50] | French: | SYSTEME OPTIQUE DE PRISE DE VUE ET D'INTERPRETATION | [2004/50] | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/50] | 25.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.06.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.12.2007 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 17.12.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 17.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 28.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 28.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.06.2008 | Decision despatched | 03.11.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 03.11.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 16.07.2008 | [2009/39] | Cited in | International search | [X]US3908082 (POWNALL LESLIE A); | [A]US4862257 (ULICH BOBBY L [US]); | [A]US5365084 (COCHRAN DON W [US], et al); | [X]DE4408072 (DEUTSCHE FORSCH LUFT RAUMFAHRT [DE]); | [X]US6046431 (BEATTIE ROBERT JOHN [GB]); | Examination | US5412200 | DE19921127 |