EP1490530 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR OXIDE PRODUCTION ON COPPER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2006 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RD CHEMICAL COMPANY 1240 Pear Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLE, Joseph 780 Bradford Street, Apt. 7 Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | 02 /
SEDLAK, Rudolf, P. 285 Elmwood Street Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03744206.8 | 04.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003US06815 | Priority number, date | US20020093097 | 05.03.2002 Original published format: US 93097 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03076685 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1490530 | Date: | 29.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C23C22/52, C23C22/63, H05K3/38 | [2005/15] | CPC: |
C23C22/63 (EP,US);
C23C22/52 (EP,US);
H05K3/385 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/01] | C23C22/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON OXID AUF KUPFER | [2005/01] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR OXIDE PRODUCTION ON COPPER | [2005/01] | French: | PROCEDES ET COMPOSITIONS DE PRODUCTION D'OXYDE SUR DU CUIVRE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 09.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 23.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/40] | 13.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS5330435 ; | [X]JPS52110235 ; | [X]DE1621516 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-3,7,8,24-26,28,29,31,41 * column 1, lines 51-54 * * column 2, lines 12-24 * * claims 1-4 *; | [X]US3650959 (SHIPLEY CHARLES R JR, et al) [X] 1-3,7,8,17,21,23-26,28,29,31,37,40,41 * column 2, line 69 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, lines 39-48 * * column 4, lines 55-71 * * column 4, line 72 - column 5, line 29 * * example 11 * * claims 1-10,14 *; | [X]US4528245 (JOBBINS JILL M [US]) [X] 1-4,7-9,12,14,15,23-26,28-33,39,41 * column 1, lines 8-22 * * column 8, lines 35-46 * * column 9, line 54 - column 10, line 2 * * column 10, lines 3-7 *; | [X]US4604160 (MURAKAMI KANJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,12,14,15,23-26,28-33,39,41 * column 1, lines 7-10 * * column 2, lines 4-22 * * examples 1-3 *; | [X]EP0469456 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1-3,7,8,23-26,28,29,31,39,41 * column 5, lines 31-33 *; | [X]US5328561 (LETIZE RAYMOND A [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7-9,13,19,22-26,28-31,35,36,40,41 * column 1, lines 7-12 * * column 5, lines 61-66 * * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 17 * * column 6, lines 38-40 * * column 10, lines 23-29 * * claim 1.2 *; | [X]EP0627499 (SHIKOKU CHEM [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8,23-26,28,29,31,39,41 * page 3, lines 44-47 * * page 5, lines 40-45 * * page 9; examples 1,5,9-comparative * * claims 1,3-7 *; | [X]EP0670379 (MEC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,6-8,10,11,16,18,20,23-29,31,32,34,38,39,41 * page 2, paragraphs 11,15,17,19,20 * * page 3, paragraphs 20-28,30,31 * * page 5 - page 6; examples 5,7,8; table 3 * * claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0757118 (MEC CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,7,8,23-26,28,29,31,39,41 * page 2, paragraph 12 - page 3, paragraph 13 * * page 3, paragraphs 15-22 * * page 4, paragraphs 23,25,26 * * page 5; examples 2,3; table 1 * * page 6, paragraph 32 * * claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP1104227 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [A] 1-41 * column 4, paragraphs 20,21,24 * * column 6, paragraphs 31,32 * * column 7, paragraphs 34-36 * * column 8, paragraphs 37-39 * * column 9, paragraphs 39-43,433 * * column 10; examples 1-comparative ** claims 1,4,6,7 *; | [PX]US2002124768 (FERRIER DONALD [US]) [PX] 1-4,7,8,12,14,15,23,25,26,28,29,31-33,36,39 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraphs 15-19,23,24,26-30 * * page 3, paragraphs 35-41 * * page 4, paragraphs 48,53; example comparative *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1978, no. 18, Database accession no. 1978-32691A, XP002318397 & JPS5330435 A 19780322 (SUMITOMO METAL MINING CO) [X] 1-3,7,8,24-26,28,29,31,39,41 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1977, no. 43, Database accession no. 1977-76767Y, XP002318398 & JPS52110235 A 19770916 (NIPPON PAINT CO LTD) [X] 1-3,7,8,24-26,28,29,31,41 * abstract * | International search | [X]US3650959 (SHIPLEY CHARLES R JR, et al); | [X]US4528245 (JOBBINS JILL M [US]); | [X]US4604160 (MURAKAMI KANJI [JP], et al); | [X]US5328561 (LETIZE RAYMOND A [US], et al); | [X]US5965036 (MAKI YOSHIRO [JP], et al) |