EP1487674 - AIRBAG DOOR AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Collins & Aikman Automotive Company Inc. 350 Stephenson Highway Troy, MI 48083 / US | [2004/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRAY, John D. 17 Bridges Street, P.O. Box 279 Union, NH 03887 / US | 02 /
BUNN, Phillip A. 24 Cornwalus Drive, South Woodham Ferrers Essex, Essex CM35YE / GB | 03 /
KORTE, Bas Zaalstraat 2 5595 GH Leende / NL | 04 /
HAYES, Chris 43 Celeborn Street, South Woodham Ferrers Essex, Essex CM37AE / GB | 05 /
BATCHELDER, Bruce 15 Forest Park Drive Rochester, NH 03868 / US | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | Kierdorf, Theodor Intecpatent Postfach 40 01 53 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/48] | Kierdorf, Theodor Intecpatent Postfach 40 01 53 51410 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | ||
Former [2004/52] | Lippert, Stachow, & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 03744223.3 | 06.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003US06919 | Priority number, date | US20020095339 | 07.03.2002 Original published format: US 95339 | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03076230 | Date: | 18.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1487674 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1487674 | Date: | 08.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [2004/52] | CPC: |
B29C44/351 (EP,US);
B60R21/20 (KR);
B60R21/201 (KR);
B60R21/205 (KR);
B60R21/2165 (EP,US);
B60R2021/21652 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AIRBAGTÜR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2004/52] | English: | AIRBAG DOOR AND METHOD OF MAKING SAME | [2004/52] | French: | PORTE DE COUSSIN GONFLABLE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2004/52] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 01.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.05.2006 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.11.2006 | BE | 08.11.2006 | CH | 08.11.2006 | CY | 08.11.2006 | CZ | 08.11.2006 | EE | 08.11.2006 | FI | 08.11.2006 | FR | 08.11.2006 | IT | 08.11.2006 | LI | 08.11.2006 | NL | 08.11.2006 | RO | 08.11.2006 | SI | 08.11.2006 | SK | 08.11.2006 | TR | 08.11.2006 | BG | 08.02.2007 | DK | 08.02.2007 | SE | 08.02.2007 | GR | 09.02.2007 | ES | 19.02.2007 | IE | 06.03.2007 | LU | 06.03.2007 | MC | 31.03.2007 | PT | 09.04.2007 | HU | 09.05.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CY | 08.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
EE | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
FR | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
IE | 06.03.2007 | ||
LU | 06.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
EE | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
FR | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
IE | 06.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/52] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
FR | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
IE | 06.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
GR | 09.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
IE | 06.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
FR | 22.06.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
IE | 06.03.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
SI | 08.11.2006 | ||
SK | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
RO | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/40] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
IT | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
DK | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
ES | 19.02.2007 | ||
PT | 09.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
BE | 08.11.2006 | ||
CH | 08.11.2006 | ||
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
LI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
NL | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 08.11.2006 | |
FI | 08.11.2006 | ||
BG | 08.02.2007 | ||
SE | 08.02.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0160664 (TEXTRON AUTOMOTIVE CO INC [US], et al) [X] 1-12* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5131678 (GARDNER JOHN A [US], et al); | [A]US5222760 (RAFFERTY SCOTT [US]); | [A]US5487558 (BALL JOHANNES [DE], et al); | [A]US5544912 (SOMMER JAMES J [US]); | [A]US5641177 (BERG MATTHIAS [DE], et al); | [A]US5772240 (VAVALIDIS KYRIAKOS [FR]); | [A]US6065771 (KAWAKUBO YASUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]USRE37540E (IANNAZZI PETER J [US], et al); | US6402189 [ ] (GRAY JOHN D [US], et al); | [AP]US6453535 (NICHOLAS ANTONIOS [US]); | [AE]US6539612 (BROWN JOSEPH ROBERT [US], et al) |