EP1485072 - HORMONE-CONTAINING TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WITH AN ACTIVE SUBSTANCE RESERVOIR BASED ON VINYLACETATE-VINYLPYRROLIDONE COPOLYMER WITH IMPROVED COHESION. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LTS LOHMANN Therapie-Systeme AG Lohmannstrasse 2 56626 Andernach / DE | [2009/18] |
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states LTS Lohmann Therapie-Systeme AG Lohmannstrasse 2 56626 Andernach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MECONI, Reinhold Alemannenstrasse 42 56567 Neuwied / DE | 02 /
KLEIN, Robert-Peter Wikingerstrasse 3 56567 Neuwied / DE | 03 /
SEIBERTZ, Frank Arienhellerstr. 64 56598 Rheinbrohl / DE | 04 /
BECKER, Franz-Josef Ringmauer 14 56567 Neuwied / DE | 05 /
GÖTTE, Ursula Im Horsberg 7 53572 Unkel / DE | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Flaccus Müller-Wolff Patentanwälte Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | ||
Former [2004/51] | Flaccus, Rolf-Dieter Patentanwalt Bussardweg 10 50389 Wesseling / DE | Application number, filing date | 03744351.2 | 12.03.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003EP02521 | Priority number, date | DE2002111832 | 16.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10211832 | [2004/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03077890 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485072 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1485072 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/70, A61K31/565, A61K47/32 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K31/565 (EP,US);
A61K47/32 (EP,US);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Title | German: | HORMONHALTIGES TRANSDERMALES THERAPEUTISCHES SYSTEM MIT EINEM WIRKSTOFFRESERVOIR AUF DER BASIS VON VINYLACETAT-VINYLPYRROLIDON-COPOLYMER MIT VERBESSERTER KOHÄSION. | [2008/52] | English: | HORMONE-CONTAINING TRANSDERMAL THERAPEUTIC SYSTEM WITH AN ACTIVE SUBSTANCE RESERVOIR BASED ON VINYLACETATE-VINYLPYRROLIDONE COPOLYMER WITH IMPROVED COHESION. | [2004/51] | French: | SYSTEME THERAPEUTIQUE TRANSDERMIQUE CONTENANT DES HORMONES, COMPORTANT UN RESERVOIR D'AGENTS ACTIFS A BASE DE COPOLYMERE DE VINYLACETATE-VINYLPYRROLIDONE PRESENTANT UNE MEILLEURE COHESION | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/51] | HORMONHALTIGES TRANSDERMALES THERAPEUTISCHES SYSTEM MIT EINEM WIRKSTOFFRESERVOIR AUF DER BASIS VON VINYLACETAT-VINYLPYRROLIDON-COPOLYMER MIT VERBESSERTER KOH SION. | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/51] | 16.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.04.2009 | CZ | 29.04.2009 | DK | 29.04.2009 | EE | 29.04.2009 | FI | 29.04.2009 | IE | 29.04.2009 | NL | 29.04.2009 | RO | 29.04.2009 | SI | 29.04.2009 | SK | 29.04.2009 | TR | 29.04.2009 | BG | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | GR | 30.07.2009 | PT | 29.08.2009 | HU | 30.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 29.04.2009 | |
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
HU | 30.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 29.04.2009 | |
CZ | 29.04.2009 | ||
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | CZ | 29.04.2009 | |
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
GR | 30.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/18] | CZ | 29.04.2009 | |
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
BG | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/10] | CZ | 29.04.2009 | |
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SK | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 29.04.2009 | |
DK | 29.04.2009 | ||
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
RO | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/08] | DK | 29.04.2009 | |
EE | 29.04.2009 | ||
FI | 29.04.2009 | ||
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 29.04.2009 | |
IE | 29.04.2009 | ||
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/51] | FI | 29.04.2009 | |
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
SI | 29.04.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/50] | FI | 29.04.2009 | |
NL | 29.04.2009 | ||
PT | 29.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/49] | FI | 29.04.2009 | |
PT | 29.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19613698 (SCHERING AG [DE]) [X] 1-23 * column 6, line 24 - line 34 * * column 9; example 5 *; | [X]WO9802147 (SCHERING AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 10; example 6 *; | [A]US5919478 (LANDRAU FELIX A [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US6007835 (BON-LAPILLONNE CHANTAL [FR], et al) [X] 1-23 * column 6, line 34 - line 43 * * column 7, line 8 - line 63 * * column 8, lines 1-32 * * example 1 * * claim 1 *; | [A]DE10012908 (LOHMANN THERAPIE SYST LTS [DE]) [A] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [DX]WO0189487 (LTS LOHMANN THERAPIE SYSTEM AG [DE], et al) [DX] 1-23 * page 8; example 1 * * claims 1-17 *; | [PX]WO02102390 (NOVEN PHARMA [US], et al) [PX] 1-23* page 26 - page 27; examples 1,2 * |