EP1485974 - COMMUTATOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.05.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kolektor Group d.o.o. Vojkova 10, p.p. 85 5280 Idrija / SI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Kolektor Group d.o.o. Vojkova 10, p.p. 85 5280 Idrija / SI | ||
Former [2004/51] | For all designated states Kolektor d.o.o. Vojkova 10, p.p. 85 5280 Idrija / SI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBAN, Valter; Grilceva 15 SI-5280 Idrija / SI | 02 /
JEZERSEK, Boris; Otalez 25 SI-5282 Cerkno / SI | [2004/51] | Representative(s) | Grättinger Möhring von Poschinger Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 16 55 82306 Starnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/51] | Grättinger & Partner (GbR) Wittelsbacherstrasse 5 82319 Starnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 03744352.0 | 12.03.2003 | [2004/51] | WO2003EP02534 | Priority number, date | DE20021012314 | 20.03.2002 Original published format: DE 10212314 | [2004/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03079503 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1485974 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.09.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H01R39/04, H01R43/06 | [2004/51] | CPC: |
H01R39/04 (EP);
H01R43/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/51] | Title | German: | KOMMUTATOR UND VERFAHREN ZU SEINER HERSTELLUNG | [2004/51] | English: | COMMUTATOR AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2004/51] | French: | COLLECTEUR ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2004/51] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/53] | 07.04.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US3457446 (FISH ARON YAKOVLEVICH ET AL) [DA] 1,6 * column 2, line 22 - line 24 *; | [A]US1075502 (T. SCOTT) [A] 1,6 * page 1, line 98 - line 104 * |