EP1518120 - ANALYSIS OF SULFATED POLYSACCHARIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2011 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2011 | New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings | 28.10.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.11.2011 [2011/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 675 West Kendall Street Cambridge, MA 02142 / US | [2006/05] |
Former [2005/13] | For all designated states Momenta Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 43 Moulton Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VENKATARAMAN, Ganesh 215 Concord Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | 02 /
SASISEKHARAN, Ram 2130 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 03 /
SUNDARAM, Malikarjun c/o Balaji Sundaram 25 Penny Lane Flemington New jersey 08812 / US | 04 /
SHRIVER, Zachary 21 Mount Pleasant Street Winchester Massachusetts 01890 / US | 05 /
QI, Yi-Wei 8318 Prestwick Dr. Manlius New York 13104 / US | [2011/29] |
Former [2005/13] | 01 /
VENKATARAMAN, Ganesh 215 Concord Road Bedford, MA 01730 / US | ||
02 /
SASISEKHARAN, Ram 2130 Massachusetts Avenue Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | |||
03 /
SUNDARAM, Malikarjun 351 Captain Eames Circle Ashland, MA 01721 / US | |||
04 /
SHRIVER, Zachary 98 Queensberry Street, Apt. 11 Boston, MA 02215 / US | |||
05 /
QI, Yi-Wei 42 Eight Street, Suite 5111 Charlestown, MA 02129 / US | Representative(s) | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | Duckett, Anthony Joseph, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Adams, Harvey Vaughan John Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/10] | Schnappauf, Georg, et al Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/13] | Grund, Martin, Dr., et al Dr. Volker Vossius, Patentanwaltskanzlei, Geibelstrasse 6 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03744629.1 | 11.03.2003 | [2005/13] | WO2003US07208 | Priority number, date | US20020363240P | 11.03.2002 Original published format: US 363240 P | US20020383903P | 28.05.2002 Original published format: US 383903 P | US20020393973P | 05.07.2002 Original published format: US 393973 P | [2005/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03078960 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1518120 | Date: | 30.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.01.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/48 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
G01N33/66 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/16 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/14 (EP);
G01N33/86 (EP,US);
G01N2400/10 (EP,US);
G01N2400/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/13] | G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/37] |
Former [2005/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANALYSE SULFATIERTER POLYSACCHARIDE | [2005/13] | English: | ANALYSIS OF SULFATED POLYSACCHARIDES | [2005/13] | French: | ANALYSE DE POLYSACCHARIDES SULFATES | [2005/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2004 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2004 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 18.08.2004 | Examination requested [2005/13] | 22.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/48] | 26.10.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.11.2011 | 30.11.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP10190250.0 / EP2284535 | EP10191227.7 / EP2402753 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - DESAI UMESH R ET AL, "Oligosaccharide composition of heparin and low molecular-weight heparins by capillary electrophoresis", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 213, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 120 - 127, XP002485468 [X] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1993.1394 | [A] - VENKATARAMAN G, "Sequencing complex polysaccharides", SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, (19991015), vol. 286, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 537 - 542, XP002179570 [A] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.286.5439.537 | [A] - DESAI UMESH R ET AL, "Molecular weight of low molecular weight heparins by 13C nuclear magnetic resonance spectroscopy", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1994), vol. 255, no. 0, ISSN 0008-6215, pages 193 - 212, XP002485469 [A] 1-36 * abstract, p. 194, lines 7 - 24, p. 198, line 3 - p. 201, line 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0008-6215(00)90979-0 | [A] - PERVIN A ET AL, "Separation of glycosaminoglycan-derived oligosaccharides by capillary electrophoresis using reverse polarity", ANALYTICAL BIOCHEMISTRY, (1994), vol. 221, no. 1, ISSN 0003-2697, pages 182 - 188, XP002485470 [A] 1-36 * abstract, p. 183 -184, "Materials and Methods", Fig 2 and 3, * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abio.1994.1395 | [A] - MALSCH R ET AL, "High-resolution capillary electrophoresis and polyacrylamide gel electrophoresis of heparins", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, NL, (19951117), vol. 716, no. 1, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 259 - 268, XP004038588 [A] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0021-9673(95)00490-E | [PA] - SUNDARAM MALLIK ET AL, "Rational design of low-molecular weight heparins with improved in vivo activity.", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20030121), vol. 100, no. 2, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 651 - 656, XP002485471 [PA] 1-36 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.252643299 | International search | [Y]WO9003791 (DIFERRANTE NICOLA [US]); | [X] - ARAKI Y. ET AL, "Application of 2-aminopyridine fluorescence labeling in the analysis of in vivo and in vitro metabolism of dextran sulfate sodium by size-exclusion high-performance liquid chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY B: BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES AND APPLICATIONS, (2001), vol. 753, no. 2, pages 209 - 215, XP004230280 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-4347(00)00541-7 | [Y] - ALBAN S. AND GASTPAR R., "Development Of Spc-Elisa: A New Assay Principle For The Study Of Sulfated Polysaccharide-Protein Interactions", JOURNAL OF BIOMOLECULAR SCREENING, (2001), vol. 6, no. 6, pages 393 - 400, XP009006013 | [Y] - JESKE W. ET AL, "Pharmacologic profile of certoparin", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, (1999), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 315 - 327, XP002903617 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.8.3.315 | [X] - KUHLE S. ET AL, "A pharmacokinetic study of tinzaparin in pediatric patients", BLOOD, (20021116), vol. 100, no. 11, XP002903646 | [X] - WATT D.K. ET AL, "Comparison of ovine, bovine and porcine mucosal heparins and low molecular weight heparins by disaccharide analyses and <13>C NMR", CARBOHYDRATE POLYMERS, (1997), vol. 33, pages 5 - 11, XP004083146 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0144-8617(97)00042-8 | [X] - DAWES J. ET AL, "The Measurement Of Heparin And Other Therapeutic Sulphated Polysaccharides In Plasma, Serum And Urine", TROMBOSIS AND HAEMOSTASIS, (1985), vol. 54, no. 3, pages 630 - 634, XP000121075 | [X] - VAN PUTTEN J. ET AL, "Determination of low molecular weight heparin in clinical laboratory", HAEMOSTASIS, (1984), vol. 14, no. 2, pages 205 - 210, XP002903651 | [X] - GUIZZARDI S. ET AL, "Pharmacokinetics and organ distribution in rats of a low molecular weight heparin", ARZNEIMITTEL-FORSCHUNG, (198711), vol. 37, no. 11, pages 1281 - 1283, XP002903645 | Examination | WO0223190 |