EP1488330 - METHOD FOR FORMING GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2004/52] | DATA REPLICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
[2013/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shinkuro, Inc. 5110 Edgemoor Lane Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2013/47] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Shinkuro, Inc. 5110 Edgemore Lane Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CROCKER, Steve 5110 Edgemoor Lane Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | 02 /
KAY, Jeffrey 8333 Magic Leaf Road Springfield, VA 22153 / US | [2004/52] | Representative(s) | AMMANN PATENTANWÄLTE AG Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Fischer, Franz, et al IPTO AG International Patent and Trademark Office Schwarztorstrasse 31 Postfach 5135 3001 Bern / CH | ||
Former [2008/20] | Fischer, Franz, et al IPTO AG Lorrainestrasse 4 Postfach 594 3000 Bern 25 / CH | ||
Former [2004/52] | Fischer, Franz Joseph IPTO S.A., P.O. Box 594 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 03744692.9 | 17.03.2003 | [2004/52] | WO2003US08036 | Priority number, date | US20020364648P | 15.03.2002 Original published format: US 364648 P | US20020382659P | 22.05.2002 Original published format: US 382659 P | US20030443239P | 28.01.2003 Original published format: US 443239 P | [2004/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03079213 | Date: | 25.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1488330 | Date: | 22.12.2004 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2004/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1488330 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.09.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, G06F15/00, G06F21/62, G06Q10/10 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
G06Q10/107 (EP,US);
G06F21/6218 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2141 (EP,US);
G06F2221/2147 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2004/52] | G06F15/16, G06F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/52] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GRUPPENBILDUNG | [2013/47] | English: | METHOD FOR FORMING GROUPS | [2013/47] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION DE GROUPES | [2013/47] |
Former [2004/52] | DATENVERVIELFÄLTIGUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2004/52] | DATA REPLICATION SYSTEM AND METHOD | ||
Former [2004/52] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DE REPRODUCTION DE DONNEES | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 15.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 15.10.2004 | Examination requested [2004/52] | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.03.2003 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2015/46] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDAI]WO0116804 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [XD] 1 * page 5, line 16 - page 13, line 26 * [A] 3 [I] 2; | [A] - GEESINK L H, "THE COORDINATION OF DISTRIBUTED ACTIVE MESSAGES IN A DYNAMIC NETWORK TOPOLOGY", COMPUTER JOURNAL, OXFORD UNIVERSITY PRESS, SURREY, GB LNKD- DOI:10.1093/COMJNL/34.6.542, (19911201), vol. 34, no. 6, ISSN 0010-4620, pages 542 - 550, XP000330331 [A] 1-3 * page 546, column l, line 59 - column r, line 13 * * page 548, column l, line 6 - line 21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/comjnl/34.6.542 | International search | [Y]US6161137 (OGDON ROBERT H [US], et al); | [YP]US2002065784 (RANZINI STEPHEN LANGE [US], et al); | [XE]US2003056093 (HUITEMA CHRISTIAN [US], et al); | [YP]US2002141560 (KHAYATAN MEDIA [SE], et al); | [A]US2003028585 (YEAGER WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [YP]US6401239 (MIRON MORDECHAY [IL]); | [Y]US6202207 (DONOHUE SEAMUS BRENDAN [IE]); | [Y]US6195432 (TAKAHASHI TOSHINARI [JP], et al); | [A]US6018747 (BURNS RANDAL CHILTON [US], et al); | [A]US5903897 (CARRIER III DAVID F [US], et al); | [A]US5809251 (MAY GREGORY J [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0116804 |