Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7108339 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2006 | B2 | US2005116593 | 02.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0302960 | 21.03.2003 | DE20204860 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1487301 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2005 | B1 | EP1487301 | 22.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP0302960 | 21.03.2003 | DE20204860 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE311131T | 15.12.2005 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP0302960 | 21.03.2003 | DE20204860 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE50301806D1 | 05.01.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE50301806 | 21.03.2003 | EP0302960 | 21.03.2003 | DE20204860 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03079855 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE20204860 | 26.03.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE20204860U | 31.07.2003 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE20204860 | 26.03.2002 |