EP1512215 - ELECTROACTIVE POLYMER DEVICES FOR MOVING FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SRI International 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2011/33] |
Former [2005/10] | For all designated states Sri International 333 Ravenswood Avenue Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PELRINE, Ronald, E. 802 Owl Drive Louisville, CO 80027 / US | 02 /
KORNBLUH, Roy, David 260 Palo Alto Drive Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
STANFORD, Scott, E. 967 Oregon Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 04 /
PEI, Qibing 46710 Paseo Padre Parkway Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 05 /
HEYDT, Richard 1090 Guinda Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 06 /
ECKERLE, Jospeh, S. Star Route, Box 20 Redwood City, CA 94025 / US | 07 /
HEIM, Jonathan, R. 61 Clarendon Road Pacifica, CA 94044 / US | [2005/10] | Representative(s) | Lotze, Rüdiger, et al Bayer MaterialScience AG BMS-ADM-LP-PL Building Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2011/09] |
Former [2006/38] | Duxbury, Stephen Arnold & Siedsma Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/20] | Stuttard, Garry Philip Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2005/10] | Browne, Robin Forsythe, Dr. Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03745165.5 | 18.03.2003 | [2005/10] | WO2003US08703 | Priority number, date | US20020365472P | 18.03.2002 Original published format: US 365472 P | US20020154449 | 21.05.2002 Original published format: US 154449 | [2005/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03081762 | Date: | 02.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1512215 | Date: | 09.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1512215 | Date: | 17.08.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02N1/00, H01L41/09, H01L41/16 | [2005/10] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP,US);
A61M5/14212 (EP,US);
A61M60/148 (EP,US);
A61M60/178 (EP,US);
A61M60/196 (EP,US);
A61M60/268 (EP,US);
A61M60/454 (EP,US);
A61M60/894 (EP,US);
A63H3/365 (EP,US);
F02G1/043 (EP,US);
F04B17/00 (EP,US);
F04B35/00 (EP,US);
F04B35/04 (EP,US);
F04B35/045 (EP,US);
F04B43/043 (EP,US);
F04B43/08 (EP,US);
F04B43/084 (EP,US);
F04B43/09 (EP,US);
F04B43/095 (EP,US);
F04B43/14 (EP,US);
F04D33/00 (EP,US);
F15C5/00 (EP,US);
F16F15/005 (EP,US);
H02N11/006 (EP,US);
H04R19/02 (EP,US);
A61M2205/0283 (EP,US);
A61M5/14216 (EP,US);
A61M5/14224 (EP,US);
A61M5/14236 (EP,US);
A61M5/14276 (EP,US);
B60G2400/60 (EP,US);
B60G2401/11 (EP,US);
B60G2401/23 (EP,US);
B60G2500/20 (EP,US);
F01L2301/00 (EP,US);
F02G2243/52 (EP,US);
F05C2225/08 (EP,US);
F25B9/14 (EP,US);
H04R23/00 (EP,US);
Y10S310/80 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROAKTIVE POLYMEREINRICHTUNGEN FÜR BEWEGLICHE FLUIDE | [2005/10] | English: | ELECTROACTIVE POLYMER DEVICES FOR MOVING FLUID | [2005/10] | French: | DISPOSITIFS DE POLYMERE ELECTRO-ACTIF POUR DEPLACEMENT DE FLUIDE | [2005/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2004 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/10] | 05.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Divisional application(s) | EP10012710.9 / EP2317639 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/30] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 22.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.07.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   08.05.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2003 | AT | 17.08.2011 | CY | 17.08.2011 | CZ | 17.08.2011 | EE | 17.08.2011 | FI | 17.08.2011 | IT | 17.08.2011 | RO | 17.08.2011 | SE | 17.08.2011 | SI | 17.08.2011 | SK | 17.08.2011 | TR | 17.08.2011 | BG | 17.11.2011 | GR | 18.11.2011 | PT | 19.12.2011 | LU | 18.03.2012 | CH | 31.03.2012 | LI | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
LU | 18.03.2012 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
TR | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
BG | 17.11.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.03.2012 | ||
LI | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
EE | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
IT | 17.08.2011 | ||
RO | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SK | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
CY | 17.08.2011 | ||
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 17.08.2011 | |
FI | 17.08.2011 | ||
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
SI | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
SE | 17.08.2011 | ||
GR | 18.11.2011 | ||
PT | 19.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 17.08.2011 | |
PT | 19.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4342936 (MARCUS MICHAEL A, et al); | [X]WO0106579 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US]); | [X]WO0159852 (STANFORD RES INST INT [US], et al); | [X]US2002013545 (SOLTANPOUR DAVID [US], et al) | International search | [A]US3050034 (BENTON ROBERT C); | [A]US4284921 (LEMONON CLAIRE, et al); | [A]US5481152 (BUSCHULTE RAINER [DE]); | [A]US5509888 (MILLER PAUL L [US]); | [A]US5933170 (TAKEUCHI YUKIHISA [JP], et al); | [A]US6093995 (LAZARUS KENNETH B [US], et al); | [A]US6343129 (PELRINE RONALD E [US], et al); | [A]US6435840 (SHARMA RAVI [US], et al); | [AE]US6545384 (PELRINE RONALD E [US], et al) |