EP1492571 - RADIOLABELLED QUINOLINE AND QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS METABOTROPIC GLUTAMATE RECEPTOR LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Janssen Pharmaceutica NV Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | For all designated states JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA N.V. Turnhoutsebaan 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LESAGE, Anne S.J., Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 02 /
BISCHOFF, François P., Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 03 /
JANSSEN, Cornelus G.M., Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | 04 /
LAVREYSEN, Hilde, Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. Turnhoutseweg 30 B-2340 Beerse / BE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Daelemans, Frank F.R., et al Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. J&J Patent Law Department Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | [2007/43] |
Former [2005/01] | Van Borm, Werner, et al Janssen Pharmaceutica N.V. J & J Patent Law Department Beerse Turnhoutseweg 30 2340 Beerse / BE | Application number, filing date | 03745282.8 | 26.03.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003EP03240 | Priority number, date | EP20020076254 | 29.03.2002 Original published format: EP 02076254 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03082350 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1492571 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/04, // A61K101:00 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61K51/0459 (EP,US);
A61K51/04 (KR);
A61K51/0463 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | 29.10.2004 | LT | 29.10.2004 | LV | 29.10.2004 | MK | 29.10.2004 | Title | German: | RADIOAKTIV MARKIERTE CHINOLIN- UND CHINOLINON-DERIVATE UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS METABOTROPE GLUTAMAT-REZEPTOR-LIGANDEN | [2005/01] | English: | RADIOLABELLED QUINOLINE AND QUINOLINONE DERIVATIVES AND THEIR USE AS METABOTROPIC GLUTAMATE RECEPTOR LIGANDS | [2005/01] | French: | DERIVES RADIOMARQUES DE QUINOLINE ET DE QUINOLINONE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QUE LIGANDS DU RECEPTEUR METABOTROPIQUE DU GLUTAMATE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 21.12.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 02.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2000169450 ; | [Y]WO9427605 (OREGON STATE [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * example - *; | [Y]WO9605818 (NPS PHARMA INC [US]) [Y] 1-20* example 3 *; | [Y]WO9903822 (UNIV GEORGETOWN [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * example - * * claim - *; | [DY]WO9926927 (NPS PHARMA INC [US], et al) [DY] 1-20 * example - * * claim - *; | [PX]WO0228837 (JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA NV [BE], et al) [PX] 1-20 * table 10 *; | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000169450 A 20000620 (KYORIN PHARMACEUT CO LTD) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * | [Y] - STONE T W, "Development and therapeutic potential of kynurenic acid and kynurenine derivatives for neuroprotection", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER TRENDS JOURNAL, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (200004), vol. 21, no. 4, ISSN 0165-6147, pages 149 - 154, XP004196017 [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-6147(00)01451-6 | [Y] - SING-YUEN S ET AL, "3-Hydroxy-quinolin-2-ones: inhibitors of [H]-glycine binding to the site associated with the NMDA receptor", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19960305), vol. 6, no. 5, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 499 - 504, XP004135016 [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * page 501 * * page 502; table . * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0960-894X(96)00031-5 | [Y] - DABHI T P ET AL, "POTENTIAL ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS: SYNTHESIS OF N,N-DIARYL/N,N-DIALKYL/N-ARYL-N-ALKYL-(2-ARYL/STYRYL-6-ACETYLQUINOLIN -4-YL)-FORMAMIDES", INDIAN JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, R.S. VERMA, LUCKNOW, IN, (199210), vol. 2, no. 2, ISSN 0971-1627, pages 137 - 138, XP000943434 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * | [Y] - BHATT D J ET AL, "STUDIES ON CHALCONES: PREPARATION AND ANTIMICROBIAL ACTIVITY OF 2-ARYL-4-CARBOXY-6-ACETYLQUINOLINE AND 2-ARYL-4-CARBOXY-6- BENZALACETOQUINOLINES", JOURNAL OF THE INDIAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, THE INDIAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CALCUTTA, IN, (198409), vol. 61, no. 9, ISSN 0019-4522, pages 816 - 818, XP000943275 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * | [DY] - MUTEL VINCENT ET AL, "Characterization of (3H)quisqualate binding to recombinant rat metabotropic glutamate 1a and 5a receptors and to rat and human brain sections.", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (200012), vol. 75, no. 6, ISSN 0022-3042, pages 2590 - 2601, XP002226239 [DY] 1-20 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1471-4159.2000.0752590.x | [Y] - PENG C T ET AL, "AN EVALUATION OF DIFFERENT METHODS FOR TRITIUM LABELLING", FUSION TECHNOLOGY, AMERICAN NUCLEAR SOCIETY. LAGRANGE PARK, ILLINOIS, US, (19920301), vol. 21, no. 2 PT 2, ISSN 0748-1896, pages 307 - 311, XP000271846 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * | [Y] - BRUNDISH ET AL, "Tritium labeling by selective debromination", JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, SUSSEX, GB, (1988), vol. 25, no. 12, ISSN 0362-4803, pages 1361 - 1369, XP002079113 [Y] 1-20 * the whole document * | by applicant | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (2000), vol. 2000, no. 9 | - TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (2000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 149 - 154 | - BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, (1996), vol. 6, no. 5, pages 499 - 504 | - JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 75, no. 6, pages 2590 - 2601 | - FUSION TECHNOLOGY, (1992), vol. 21, no. 2, pages 307 - 311 | - JOURNAL OF LABELLED COMPOUNDS AND RADIOPHARMACEUTICALS, (1988), vol. 25, no. 12, pages 1361 - 1369 |