EP1494909 - BRAKE APPLICATION DEVICE COMPRISING AN ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED WEAR ADJUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.10.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states KNORR-BREMSE Systeme für Schienenfahrzeuge GmbH Moosacher Strasse 80 80809 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUDERER, Erich Waldstr. 7A 82256 Fürstenfeldbruck / DE | 02 /
WOLFSTEINER, Peter Winzererstr. 136 80797 München / DE | 03 /
WAGNER, Thomas Heiterwanger Str. 58 81373 München / DE | 04 /
VOHLA, Manfred Himmelhofgasse 60 1130 Wien / AT | [2005/02] | Application number, filing date | 03745291.9 | 31.03.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003EP03315 | Priority number, date | DE2002114670 | 03.04.2002 Original published format: DE 10214670 | [2005/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03082650 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494909 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494909 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B61H15/00, F16D65/56 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
F16D65/56 (EP,US);
B60T17/228 (EP,US);
B61H15/0028 (EP,US);
B61H5/00 (EP,US);
F16D65/28 (EP,US);
F16D65/567 (EP,US);
B60L2200/26 (EP,US);
F16D2065/386 (EP,US);
F16D2121/24 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BREMSZUSPANNEINRICHTUNG MIT ELEKTRISCH BETÄTIGTEM VERSCHLEISSNACHSTELLER | [2005/02] | English: | BRAKE APPLICATION DEVICE COMPRISING AN ELECTRICALLY ACTUATED WEAR ADJUSTER | [2005/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE DE FREIN DOTE D'UN MECANISME A COMMANDE ELECTRIQUE POUR LE REGLAGE EN FONCTION DE L'USURE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 25.05.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.11.2007 | CZ | 28.11.2007 | DK | 28.11.2007 | EE | 28.11.2007 | FI | 28.11.2007 | GB | 28.11.2007 | IE | 28.11.2007 | NL | 28.11.2007 | RO | 28.11.2007 | SI | 28.11.2007 | SK | 28.11.2007 | TR | 28.11.2007 | BG | 28.02.2008 | GR | 29.02.2008 | ES | 11.03.2008 | BE | 31.03.2008 | CH | 31.03.2008 | LI | 31.03.2008 | LU | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | PT | 28.04.2008 | HU | 29.05.2008 | [2010/37] |
Former [2010/34] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
GB | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
LU | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
HU | 29.05.2008 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
GB | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
LU | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/34] | CY | 28.11.2007 | |
CZ | 28.11.2007 | ||
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
GB | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
EE | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
GB | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
GR | 29.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2008 | ||
LI | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2009/03] | CZ | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
GB | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
IE | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | CZ | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
PT | 28.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
RO | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
SK | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/35] | CZ | 28.11.2007 | |
DK | 28.11.2007 | ||
FI | 28.11.2007 | ||
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 28.11.2007 | |
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
SI | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/24] | FI | 28.11.2007 | |
NL | 28.11.2007 | ||
BG | 28.02.2008 | ||
ES | 11.03.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US4006801 (BAYLISS JOHN PATRICK) [X] 1-3 * column 2, line 19 - column 5, line 19; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE3423510 (KNORR BREMSE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-3 * page 8, line 12 - page 17, line 23; figure 2 *; | [A]US4895227 (GRENIER MICHEL [FR], et al) [A] 1* column 4, line 7 - column 8, line 20 * | by applicant | EP0699846 |