EP1495020 - N-(MORPHOLIN-2YL) METHYL ACETAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS CCR-3 ANTAGONISTS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 ONN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANCLIFF, Rachael Ann GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 02 /
COOK, Caroline Mary GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 03 /
ELDRED, Colin David GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 04 /
GORE, Paul Martin GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 05 /
HARRISON, Lee Andrew GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 06 /
HAYES, Martin Alistair GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 07 /
HODGSON, Simon Teanby GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 08 /
JUDD, Duncan Bruce GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 09 /
KEELING, Suzanne Elaine GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 10 /
LEWELL, Xiao Qing GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 11 /
MILLS, Gail GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 12 /
ROBERTSON, Graeme Michael GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 13 /
SWANSON, Stephen GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 14 /
WALKER, Andrew John GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | 15 /
WILKINSON, Mark GlaxoSmithKline, Gunnels Wood Road Stevenage, Hertfordshire SG1 2NY / GB | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Povey, Alexander W.G. GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Povey, Alexander W.G. GlaxoSmithKline Corporate Intellectual Property (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | Application number, filing date | 03745300.8 | 27.03.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003EP03350 | Priority number, date | GB20020007445 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: GB 0207445 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03082863 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495020 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, C07D241/08, C07D309/38, A61K31/5377, A61P11/06, A61P17/06, A61P17/04, A61P25/28, A61P37/06, A61P37/08, A61P9/10, A61P1/06, A61P27/14 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
C07D413/12 (EP);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/14 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 12.10.2004 | LV | 12.10.2004 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-(MORPHOLIN-2-YL)METHYLACETAMID DERIVATE ALS FÜR DIE BEHANDLUNG VON ENTZÜNDLICHEN ERKRANKUNGEN GEEIGNETE CCR-3-ANTAGONISTEN | [2005/02] | English: | N-(MORPHOLIN-2YL) METHYL ACETAMIDE DERIVATIVES AS CCR-3 ANTAGONISTS USEFUL IN THE TREATMENT OF INFLAMMATORY DISEASES | [2005/02] | French: | DERIVES DE N-(MORPHOLIN-2YL) METHYLE ACETAMIDE SERVANT D'ANTAGONISTES DE CCR-3 ET UTILISES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES INFLAMMATOIRES | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 12.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 12.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 12.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 15.02.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/52] | 29.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19624668 (KLINGE CO CHEM PHARM FAB [DE]) [X] 1-23 * example 374; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0903349 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [A] 1-23 * page 45, line 42 - line 47; claims 1,72 *; | [PX]WO0226722 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-23 * intermediates (V), p.17, intermediates (IV), p.15; page 24, line 24 - line 28; claim 1 * | [X] - KATO S ET AL, "NOVEL BENZAMIDES AS SELECTIVE AND POTENT GASTRIC PROKINETIC AGENTS 1. SYNTHESIS AND STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIPS OF N-(2-MORPHOLINYL)ALKYLBENZAMIDES", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (199005), vol. 33, no. 5, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1406 - 1413, XP001037844 [X] 16,17 * scheme II, compound 9; Scheme IV, compound 15c; Table I; Table II, compound 48. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00167a020 |