EP1495635 - AUTOMATIC ADVERTISEMENT INSERTION INTO AN INTERACTIVE TELEVISION TICKER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arris Group, Inc. 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | [2019/19] |
Former [2011/39] | For all designated states Arris Group, Inc. 3871 Lakefield Drive Suwanee, GA 30024 / US | ||
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states Vulcan Ventures Inc. 505 Fifth Ave. S, Suite 900 Seattle, WA 98104 / US | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Digeo, Inc. 8815 122nd Avenue NE Kirkland, WA 98033 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKENNA, Thomas, P., Jr. 21116 SE 28th Place Sammamish, WA 98075 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Openshaw & Co. 8 Castle Street Farnham, Surrey GU9 7HR / GB | [2019/19] |
Former [2005/02] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03745661.3 | 28.03.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US09674 | Priority number, date | US20020112071 | 28.03.2002 Original published format: US 112071 | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03084219 | Date: | 09.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495635 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1495635 | Date: | 08.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/422, H04N21/4223, H04N21/45, H04N21/478, H04N21/488, H04N21/81, H04N21/858, H04N5/445, H04N7/173, G06F3/00, G06F3/0481, G06F13/00, G06Q30/02, // H04N21/462 | [2018/46] | CPC: |
G06F3/0481 (EP);
G06Q30/02 (EP);
H04N21/42203 (EP);
H04N21/4223 (EP);
H04N21/4316 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N21/47 (EP);
H04N21/478 (EP);
H04N21/47815 (EP);
H04N21/4886 (EP);
H04N21/812 (EP);
H04N21/858 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2005/36] | H04N5/445, G06F3/00, G06F13/00, H04N7/173 | ||
Former IPC [2005/02] | H04N5/445, G06F3/00, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/19] |
Former [2005/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES EINFÜGEN VON WERBUNG IN EINEN INTERAKTIVEN FERNSEH-TICKER | [2005/02] | English: | AUTOMATIC ADVERTISEMENT INSERTION INTO AN INTERACTIVE TELEVISION TICKER | [2005/02] | French: | INSERTION DE PUBLICITE AUTOMATIQUE DANS UN TELESCRIPTEUR DE TELEVISION INTERACTIVE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 28.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 28.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 28.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 22.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 26.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2016 | Opposition(s) | 11.02.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2011 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   24.05.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.03.2003 | AT | 08.05.2019 | CY | 08.05.2019 | CZ | 08.05.2019 | DK | 08.05.2019 | EE | 08.05.2019 | ES | 08.05.2019 | FI | 08.05.2019 | IT | 08.05.2019 | MC | 08.05.2019 | NL | 08.05.2019 | RO | 08.05.2019 | SE | 08.05.2019 | SI | 08.05.2019 | SK | 08.05.2019 | TR | 08.05.2019 | BG | 08.08.2019 | GR | 09.08.2019 | PT | 08.09.2019 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/50] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
MC | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
TR | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
IT | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
EE | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
SK | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 08.05.2019 | |
CZ | 08.05.2019 | ||
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
RO | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 08.05.2019 | |
DK | 08.05.2019 | ||
ES | 08.05.2019 | ||
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
BG | 08.08.2019 | ||
GR | 09.08.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
NL | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | ||
SE | 08.05.2019 | ||
PT | 08.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 08.05.2019 | |
FI | 08.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]GB2309134 (CONCEPT DEV LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,15,19 * the whole document * [A] 2-14,16-18,20-23; | [A]US5663757 (MORALES FERNANDO [US]) [A] 1-23 * column A *; | [A]US5677708 (MATTHEWS III JOSEPH H [US], et al) [A] 1-23* column A *; | [A]US6025837 (MATTHEWS III JOSEPH H [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 9, line 56 - column 11, line 57 *; | [YA]US6172677 (STAUTNER JOHN P [US], et al) [Y] 1,15,19 * column 1, line 36 - column 3, line 8 * [A] 2-14,16-18,20-23 | International search | [XE]US6564379 (KNUDSON EDWARD B [US], et al); | [Y]US6029045 (PICCO MARTIN R [US], et al); | [AP]US6526577 (KNUDSON EDWARD B [US], et al); | [AP]US6536041 (KNUDSON EDWARD B [US], et al) | Examination | WO9956473 | US2001001160 |