EP1494881 - AIR PURIFICATION DEVICE WITH DETACHABLE STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states VALEO SYSTEMES THERMIQUES 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | ||
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states VALEO CLIMATISATION 8 rue Louis-Lormand - B.P. 13 78321 La Verrière Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAUMIER, Carine 33, rue Saint-Honoré F-78000 Versailles / FR | 02 /
FEUILLARD, Vincent 5, rue Husson Carcenac F-78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | 03 /
LADRECH, Frédéric 21 sente d'Arbois F-78310 Maurepas / FR | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2005/22] |
Former [2005/02] | Leveille, Christophe Valeo Climatisation, 8, rue Louis Lormand 78321 La Verriere / FR | Application number, filing date | 03746329.6 | 09.04.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003FR01127 | Priority number, date | FR20020004648 | 12.04.2002 Original published format: FR 0204648 | [2005/02] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03086793 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1494881 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1494881 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | FR | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60H3/06 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
B60H3/0658 (EP);
B60H2003/0675 (EP);
B60H2003/0691 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTREINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINER ABTRENNBAREN KONSTRUKTION | [2005/02] | English: | AIR PURIFICATION DEVICE WITH DETACHABLE STRUCTURE | [2005/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PURIFICATION D AIR A STRUCTURE SEPARABLE | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 18.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 09.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.06.2006 | EE | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | GB | 14.06.2006 | IE | 14.06.2006 | IT | 14.06.2006 | NL | 14.06.2006 | RO | 14.06.2006 | SI | 14.06.2006 | SK | 14.06.2006 | TR | 14.06.2006 | BG | 14.09.2006 | DK | 14.09.2006 | GR | 15.09.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | HU | 15.12.2006 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
CY | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
GR | 15.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
RO | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
GB | 14.06.2006 | ||
IE | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
DK | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
NL | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SI | 14.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9637281 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1 * figure 7 *; | [A]EP0960644 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2795656 (VALEO [FR]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 6 - line 12; figure 1 * |