EP1492474 - STENT ASSEMBLY AND DEVICE FOR APPLICATION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corline Systems AB Box 956 751 09 Uppsala / SE | [2005/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARSSON, Rolf Blomstervägen 19 S-756 52 Uppsala / SE | 02 /
GROTH, Carl-Gustaf Sköldvägen 26 S-182 64 Djursholm / SE | [2005/01] | Representative(s) | Lindgren, Anders, et al BRANN AB P.O. Box 12246 102 26 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/01] | Lindgren, Anders, et al Dr. Ludwig Brann Patentbyra AB, P.O. Box 1344, Drottninggatan 7 751 43 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 03746520.0 | 04.04.2003 | [2005/01] | WO2003SE00545 | Priority number, date | SE20020001053 | 08.04.2002 Original published format: SE 0201053 | [2005/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03086238 | Date: | 23.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1492474 | Date: | 05.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, // A61L27:54 | [2005/01] | CPC: |
A61F2/064 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61F2002/075 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STENTANORDNUNG UND APPLIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG DAFÜR | [2005/01] | English: | STENT ASSEMBLY AND DEVICE FOR APPLICATION THEREOF | [2005/01] | French: | ENSEMBLE ENDOPROTHESE ET DISPOSITIF POUR SA MISE EN PLACE | [2005/01] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/01] | 13.03.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/03] | 25.08.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0819412 (CORDIS CORP [US]); | [A]WO0215824 (KENSEY NASH CORP [US], et al); | [A]US5700286 (TARTAGLIA JOSEPH M [US], et al) |