EP1500072 - MULTI-PICTURE LOUVERED ADVERTISING SIGN APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states M.P. Sign Ltd. P.O. Box 5157 46100 Herzliya / IL | [2005/16] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Zukov, Oleg 68 Derech Lev HaSharon 42823 Tzoran / IL | ||
For all designated states Rendel, Zohar Rimalt Elimelech 9, Lev HaPark 43730 Raanana / IL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZUKOV, Oleg 68 Derech Lev HaSharon 42823 Tzoran / IL | [2005/04] | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer, John James Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, Rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2005/19] | Dennemeyer, John James Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2005/04] | Lampe, Sigmar Dennemeyer & Associates s.a., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 03746882.4 | 22.04.2003 | [2005/04] | WO2003IL00329 | Priority number, date | US20020374204P | 22.04.2002 Original published format: US 374204 P | [2005/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090189 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1500072 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G09F11/02 | [2005/04] | CPC: |
G09F11/30 (EP,US);
G09F11/00 (EP,US);
G09F11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRBILD-JALOUSIEWERBESCHILDVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [2005/04] | English: | MULTI-PICTURE LOUVERED ADVERTISING SIGN APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2005/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR PANNEAU PUBLICITAIRE PERSIENNE A IMAGES MULTIPLES | [2005/04] | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 16.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/04] | 01.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/19] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2006 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2006 | 30.04.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5003716 (DYAR ROYCE M [US]); | [A]US5255465 (PEREZ HECTOR [US]); | [A]US5416996 (CLEMENS RICHARD [US], et al); | [A]US5511330 (HAVENS DALE I [US]); | [A]US5572816 (ANDERSON JR TAZ L [US], et al); | [A]US5987792 (REYES-PARIS LUIS ALFONSO [MX]); | [A]US6206077 (STANFILL ARTHUR A [US]) |