EP1495147 - A SYSTEM TO PRODUCE SUGAR FROM PLANT MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nalco Company 1601 W. Diehl Road Naperville, IL 60563-1198 / US | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states CO2 Solutions, LLC 1740-H Dell Range Boulevard No. 253 Cheyenne, WY 82009 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SANDERS, David, O. 1105 Westshore Place Loveland, CO 80538 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | HGF 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/29] | Harrison Goddard Foote Belgrave Hall Belgrave Street Leeds LS2 8DD / GB | ||
Former [2006/09] | Want, Clifford James, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | ||
Former [2005/40] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2005/02] | Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03746911.1 | 06.01.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US00331 | Priority number, date | US20020123120 | 15.04.2002 Original published format: US 123120 | US20020403594P | 13.08.2002 Original published format: US 403594 P | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03089673 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1495147 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.10.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C13D3/06, C13D3/00 | [2005/38] | CPC: |
C13B20/02 (EP,US);
C13B20/00 (EP,US);
C13B20/007 (EP,US);
C13B20/06 (EP,US);
C13B20/10 (EP,US);
Y02P40/40 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/02] | C13D3/00, C13D3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR PRODUKTION VON ZUCKER AUS PFLANZLICHEN MATERIALIEN | [2005/02] | English: | A SYSTEM TO PRODUCE SUGAR FROM PLANT MATERIALS | [2005/02] | French: | FABRICATION DE SUCRE A PARTIR DE MATIERES VEGETALES | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2004 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2004 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 14.10.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 26.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/06] | 08.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/06] | Request for further processing for: | 16.08.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 16.08.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.09.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]US2164186 (BROWN ROBERT J, et al) [DX] 1,2 * claims 1,3,8 * [Y] 3-7; | [A]US3506484 (DOMSA FLAVIUS N) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [XY]US4234350 (SUZOR NORLAND L C) [X] 1-7 * column 9, lines 12-34; figure 1; claims 1,7 * * column 4, lines 1-63 * [Y] 3-7; | [DX]US5480490 (TOTH LASZLO [US], et al)[DX] 1,2; | [X]WO9624695 (WESTERN SUGAR COMPANY [US]) [X] 1,2 * page 7, line 32 - page 38, line 3; claims 1,3 *; | [DXY]US5928429 (DUNCAN DAVID MACK [US], et al) [DX] 1,2 * column 2, line 15 - column 5, line 57; figure 1; claims 5,12,19 * [Y] 3-7; | [XY]WO0114594 (TATE & LYLE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figure 3; example 13; claims 19,20,63,64 * [Y] 3-7; | [XY]WO0114595 (TATE & LYLE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 2,3; claims 16,59,60 * [Y] 3-7 | International search | [X]US5480490 (TOTH LASZLO [US], et al); | [X]US5928429 (DUNCAN DAVID MACK [US], et al) |