EP1495336 - TEST HEAD POSITIONER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states inTEST Corporation 7 Esterbrook Lane Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US | [2006/21] |
Former [2005/02] | For all designated states Intest IP Corporation 7 Esterbrook Lane Cherry Hill, NJ 08003 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEST, Christopher, L. 17 Goose Pond Road Tabernacle, NJ 08088 / US | [2005/02] | Representative(s) | Marx, Lothar, et al Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Postfach 86 02 45 81629 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Marx, Lothar, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Schwabe, Sandmair, Marx Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03746969.9 | 11.04.2003 | [2005/02] | WO2003US11312 | Priority number, date | US20020372841P | 15.04.2002 Original published format: US 372841 P | [2005/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03089834 | Date: | 30.10.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1495336 | Date: | 12.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/073 | [2005/02] | CPC: |
G01R31/2887 (EP,US);
F16M11/00 (KR);
B25J9/023 (EP,US);
B25J9/04 (EP,US);
F16M11/10 (EP,US);
F16M11/18 (EP,US);
F16M11/2071 (EP,US);
F16M11/2085 (EP,US);
F16M11/2092 (EP,US);
F16M11/24 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONIERER FÜR EINEN TESTKOPF | [2005/02] | English: | TEST HEAD POSITIONER SYSTEM | [2005/02] | French: | SYSTEME DE POSITIONNEMENT D'UNE TETE D'ESSAI | [2005/02] | Entry into regional phase | 15.09.2004 | National basic fee paid | 15.09.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.09.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.09.2004 | Examination requested [2005/02] | 05.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/18] | 10.12.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2008 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0041536 (INTEST IP CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [A]US5900737 (GRAHAM DANIEL J [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * abstract *; | [XA]US5976156 (TAYLOR RUSSELL HIGHSMITH [US], et al) [X] 11 * figure 1 * [A] 1-10; | [A]US5197846 (UNO MASAHITO [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * claim 1 * | by applicant | US4527942 | US4705447 | US5450766 | WO0041536 | US704 |