27.03.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 29.04.2009 [2009/18] |
03.12.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.05.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.01.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
03.11.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.07.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.04.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 24.05.2006 [2006/21] |
05.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
16.12.2005 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.08.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
17.06.2005 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
17.06.2005 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
13.04.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.11.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
26.11.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
24.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.12.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|