Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7276894 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2007 | B2 | US2006001416 | 05.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0311312 | 11.04.2003 | US51151005 | 26.05.2005 | US37284102 | 15.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20040106344 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US0311312 | 11.04.2003 | US37284102 | 15.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2005523445 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US0311312 | 11.04.2003 | US37284102 | 15.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003226352 | Global Dossier | 03.11.2003 | A8 | AU2003226352 | 03.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US0311312 | 11.04.2003 | US37284102 | 15.04.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1495336 | Global Dossier | 12.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0311312 | 11.04.2003 | US37284102 | 15.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03089834 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2004 | A3 | WO03089834 | 30.10.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US37284102 | 15.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1646925 | 27.07.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US37284102 | 15.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MY141486 | 30.04.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US37284102 | 15.04.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI276495B | 21.03.2007 | B | TW200306243 | 16.11.2003 | A | Priority number | Date | US37284102 | 15.04.2002 |