EP1496973 - DRAINAGE DEVICES AND METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Maple Grove, MN 55311 / US | [2005/51] |
Former [2005/03] | For all designated states SciMed Life Systems, Inc. One SciMed Place Maple Grove, Minnesota 55311-1156 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCWEENEY, John, O. 90 Academy Hill Road, Apt. 2 Brighton, MA 02135 / US | [2005/03] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Joachimstaler Strasse 12 10719 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/03] | Lock, Graham James, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03747290.9 | 17.04.2003 | [2005/03] | WO2003US12024 | Priority number, date | US20020128070 | 23.04.2002 Original published format: US 128070 | [2005/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03090830 | Date: | 06.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1496973 | Date: | 19.01.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1496973 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61F2/04 | [2005/03] | CPC: |
A61M27/008 (EP,US);
A61F2/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2010/13] |
Former [2005/03] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAINAGEVORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN | [2005/03] | English: | DRAINAGE DEVICES AND METHODS | [2005/03] | French: | PROCEDES ET DISPOSITIFS DE DRAINAGE | [2005/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/03] | 20.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.03.2010 | FR | 31.05.2010 | GB | 30.06.2010 | [2012/06] |
Former [2011/35] | NL | 31.03.2010 | |
GB | 30.06.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9611721 (MENLO CARE INC [US]) [X] 21-27 * page 49, line 16 - page 50, line 6; figure - * [A] 1-9,12-18; | [XA]DE4213480 (UROTECH MED TECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 21-27 * the whole document * [A] 1-9,12-18; | [XA]US6332892 (DESMOND III JOSEPH P [US], et al) [X] 21-27 * column W * [A] 1-9,12-18; | [XA]US5176626 (SOEHENDRA NIB [DE]) [X] 21-23,25-27 * column 3, line 15 - line 60; figure - * [A] 1-9,12-18; | [XA]US2001053936 (WHITMORE WILLET F [US]) [X] 21-23,25-27 * column 5, paragraph 47; figure - * [A] 1-9,12-18; | [A]WO9717094 (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-26 * abstract * | by applicant | WO9611721 |