EP1549872 - THREADED PIPE JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 12.06.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenaris Connections Ltd. 112 Bonadie Street Kingstown / VC | [2013/10] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Tenaris Connections AG Bahnhofstrasse 7, Postafch 48 9494 Schaan / LI | ||
Former [2005/27] | For all designated states Tenaris Connections AG Bahnofstrasse 7, Postafch 48 9494 Schaan / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARCAGNO, Gabriel, E. Berutti 495 Campana (B) / AR | 02 /
DELLA PINA, Giuseppe Via delle Querce 7 24048 Treviolo, IT / IT | 03 /
TOSCANO, Rita, G. Goya 285 Buenos Aires, AR / AR | 04 /
COPPOLA, Tommaso Via Domenico Purificato, 188 00125 Roma, IT / IT | [2005/27] | Representative(s) | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Viale Achille Papa, 30 20149 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Gervasi, Gemma, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/27] | Gervasi, Gemma, Dr., et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A., Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03747430.1 | 29.04.2003 | [2005/27] | WO2003EP04459 | Priority number, date | IT2002RM00234 | 30.04.2002 Original published format: IT RM20020234 | [2005/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03093716 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1549872 | Date: | 06.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1549872 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F16L15/06 | [2005/27] | CPC: |
F16L15/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/27] | Title | German: | GEWINDEROHRVERBINDUNG | [2005/27] | English: | THREADED PIPE JOINT | [2005/27] | French: | RACCORD FILETE POUR TUYAUX | [2005/27] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/27] | 25.11.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.2007
16.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE VALLOUREC OIL AND GAS FRANCE 54, rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR Opponent's representative Pellicani, Félix Angelo Vallourec & Mannesman Tubes Division Propriété Industrielle 27 Avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/07] |
Former [2007/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.2007
16.04.2007
ADMISSIBLE VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE 54, rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR Opponent's representative Pellicani, Félix Angelo VALLOUREC & MANNESMANN TUBES Division Propriété Industrielle 27 Avenue du Général Leclerc 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2007/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.03.2007
VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS FRANCE 54, rue Anatole France 59620 Aulnoye-Aymeries / FR Opponent's representative Pellicani, Félix Angelo Vallourec & Mannesmann Tubes Division Propriété Industrielle 130 rue de Silly 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 23.04.2007 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.10.2007 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.03.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.05.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [ N /P ] | 04.05.2015 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2015/29] | 04.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 02.07.2009 | Appeal received No. T1393/09 | 28.08.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.05.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 23.06.2009 | Appeal received No. T1393/09 | 21.08.2009 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.05.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 04.05.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.05.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 14.06.2006 | CY | 14.06.2006 | CZ | 14.06.2006 | EE | 14.06.2006 | FI | 14.06.2006 | LI | 14.06.2006 | SK | 14.06.2006 | BG | 14.09.2006 | PT | 14.11.2006 | HU | 15.12.2006 | IE | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | [2015/33] |
Former [2011/32] | CY | 14.06.2006 | |
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
HU | 15.12.2006 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/43] | CY | 14.06.2006 | |
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
HU | 15.12.2006 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/39] | CY | 14.06.2006 | |
CZ | 14.06.2006 | ||
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | CZ | 14.06.2006 | |
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | CZ | 14.06.2006 | |
EE | 14.06.2006 | ||
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | CZ | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
BG | 14.09.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | CZ | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
IE | 30.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/41] | CZ | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
IT | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | CZ | 14.06.2006 | |
FI | 14.06.2006 | ||
SK | 14.06.2006 | ||
PT | 14.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 14.06.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3870351 (MATSUKI NORIO) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]EP0949441 (SUMITOMO METAL IND [JP]) [A] 1* figure - *; | [A]WO0014441 (VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 15, line 24 - line 33; figure - *; | [A]WO0198620 (VALLOUREC MANNESMANN OIL & GAS [FR], et al) [A] 1-9 * page 14, line 30 - line 34 * * table 2 * |