EP1504610 - SYSTEM FOR THE DYNAMIC MULTIPLEXING OF DIGITAL STREAMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6, Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CURET, Dominique 38, rue Lariboisière F-35235 THORIGNE-FOUILLARD / FR | 02 /
RELIER, Stéphanie 16, rue des Tournesols F-35410 DOMLOUP / FR | 03 /
ROUX, Catherine 32, Boulevard Chézy F-35000 RENNES / FR | 04 /
MAISONNEUVE, Antoine 48, Cours de la Vilaine, Appt.7, Bat.G F-35510 CESSON SEVIGNE / FR | [2005/20] |
Former [2005/06] | 01 /
CURET, Dominique 38, rue Lariboisière F-35235 THORIGNE-FOUILLARD / FR | ||
02 /
RELIER, Stéphanie 16, rue des Tournesols F-35410 DOMLOUP / FR | |||
03 /
ROUX, Catherine 32, Boulevard Chézy F-35000 RENNES / FR | |||
04 /
MAISONNEUVE, Antoine 32, rue Edmond Rostand F-35000 RENNES / FR | Representative(s) | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon Technopole Atalante 16B Rue de Jouanet BP 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | ||
Former [2005/06] | Vidon, Patrice Cabinet Vidon 16 B, rue Jouanet - B.P. 90333 35703 Rennes Cedex 7 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03747484.8 | 30.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003FR01370 | Priority number, date | FR20020005605 | 03.05.2002 Original published format: FR 0205605 | [2005/06] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03094531 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1504610 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1504610 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.11.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/52 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
H04N7/52 (EP,US);
H04N7/24 (KR);
H04N19/89 (KR);
H04N21/236 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM DYNAMISCHEN MULTIPLEXEN DIGITALER STRÖME | [2005/06] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE DYNAMIC MULTIPLEXING OF DIGITAL STREAMS | [2005/06] | French: | SYSTEME DE MULTIPLEXAGE DYNAMIQUE DE FLUX NUMERIQUES | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 03.11.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.02.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 13.02.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | CZ | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | IE | 04.04.2007 | NL | 04.04.2007 | RO | 04.04.2007 | SI | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BE | 30.04.2007 | CH | 30.04.2007 | LI | 30.04.2007 | LU | 30.04.2007 | MC | 30.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | HU | 05.10.2007 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/39] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
LU | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/34] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
MC | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
RO | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BE | 30.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/13] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
CH | 30.04.2007 | ||
LI | 30.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CZ | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IE | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/09] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
NL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/49] | FI | 04.04.2007 | |
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 04.04.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9838765 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [Y]FR2797548 (THOMSON MULTIMEDIA SA [FR]); | [A]US6205140 (PUTZOLU DAVID M [US], et al); |