EP1505093 - HYDROGEL OF (SEMI)INTERPENETRATING NETWORK STRUCTURE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National University Corporation Hokkaido University 8, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0808 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states National University Corporation Hokkaido University 8, Kita 8-jyo Nishi 5-chome Kita-ku Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 060-0808 / JP | ||
Former [2005/06] | For all designated states Hokkaido Technology Licensing Office Co., Ltd. 8-1, Kita 7 Jou Nishi 2-chome, Kita-ku Sapporo-Shi, Hokkaido 060-0807 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSADA, Yoshihito 11-17-3, Kitanosawa 1-chome Minami-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 005-083 / JP | 02 /
GONG, Jian, Ping 4-16-1406, Sumikawa 3-jyo 4-chome Minami-ku, Sapporo-shi, Hokkaido 005-000 / JP | [2005/06] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/06] | Betten & Resch Patentanwälte, Theatinerstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03747538.1 | 10.04.2003 | [2005/06] | WO2003JP04556 | Priority number, date | WO2002JP04358 | 01.05.2002 Original published format: PCT/JP02/04358 | [2005/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03093337 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1505093 | Date: | 09.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1505093 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08F265/00 | [2005/06] | CPC: |
C08F283/00 (EP,US);
C08F265/00 (KR);
A61L27/52 (EP,US);
C08F220/585 (EP,US);
C08J3/02 (KR);
C08L2205/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/06] | Title | German: | HYDROGEL MIT (SEMI)INTERPENETRIERENDER NETZWERKSTRUKTUR UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2005/06] | English: | HYDROGEL OF (SEMI)INTERPENETRATING NETWORK STRUCTURE AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2005/06] | French: | HYDROGEL A STRUCTURE DE RESEAU A SEMI-INTERPENETRATION ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION ASSOCIE | [2005/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2004 | Translation filed | 26.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.11.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 18.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/06] | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2010 | BE | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | HU | 29.09.2010 | IT | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | ES | 09.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | IE | 10.04.2011 | LU | 10.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
LU | 10.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
LU | 10.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
LU | 10.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
LU | 10.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
IE | 10.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
Former [2011/40] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/31] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IT | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/10] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 29.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06200224 ; | [X]US4071508 (STECKLER ROBERT) [X] 1-29 * column 1, line 6 - line 20 * * column 3, line 7 - column 8, line 27 * * column 8, line 57 - line 66; claims 1-6 *; | [X]WO0007636 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * page 6, line 8 - line 13 * * page 9, line 13 - page 10, line 11 * * page 13, line 27 - page 15, line 25 * * page 16, line 6 - line 18 * * page 18, line 1 - page 19, line 17; claims 1-15 *; | [X]US2001044482 (HU HOPIN [US], et al) [X] 1-29 * page 4, paragraph 30 - paragraph 35 * * claims 1-16 *; | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1994, no. 33, Database accession no. 1994-269661, XP002490495 & JPH06200224 A 19940719 (NITTO CHEM. IND. CO., LTD.) [A] 1 * column A * | International search | [A]JPH10500148 ; | [A]JP2002501563 ; | [A]JP2002212452 (HOKKAIDO TECH LICENSING OFFICE) |