EP1508516 - COMPACT WATER-JET PROPULSION AND STEERING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Federalnoe Gosudarstvennoe Unitarnoe Predpriyatie "Mashinostroitelnoe Predpriyatie "Zvyozdochka" pr. Mashinostroitelei, 12 Severodvinsk, 164509 / RU | For all designated states Federalnoe Gosudarstvennoe Unitarnoe Predpriyatie "Tsentralny Nauchno-Issledovatelsky Institut Imeniakademika A.N. Krylova" Moskovskoe shosse, 44 St. Petersburg 196158 / RU | [2005/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAVLJUDOV, Marat Abdrakhmanovich ul. Varshavskaya, 47-56 St.Petersburg, 196191 / RU | 02 /
PASHIN, Valentin Mikhailovich ul. Sofiiskaya, 30-2-69 St. Petersburg, 192236 / RU | 03 /
PYSTOSHNY, Aleksandr Vladimirovich ul. Malaya Balkanskaya, 3-244 St.Petersburg, 192228 / RU | 04 /
YAKOVLEVA, Olga Vasilievna ul. Budapeshtskaya, 36-1-88 St.Petersburg, 192071 / RU | 05 /
DANILOV, Evgeny Vasilievich ul. Vasilisy Kozhinoi, 16-68 Moscow, 121096 / RU | 06 /
KALISTRATOV, Nikolai Yakovlevich ul. Nakhimova, 6-86 Severodvinsk, 164509 / RU | 07 /
SHTEFAN, Vladimir Viktorovich ul. Boichuka, 7/5-5 Severodvinsk, 164500 / RU | [2005/08] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2005/08] | Jeck, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 03747547.2 | 28.04.2003 | [2005/08] | WO2003RU00199 | Priority number, date | RU20020112283 | 06.05.2002 Original published format: RU 2002112283 | [2005/08] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03093103 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1508516 | Date: | 23.02.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 13.11.2003 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B63H11/08, B63H11/10, B63H11/103, B63H11/11 | [2005/08] | CPC: |
B63H11/103 (EP,KR);
B63H11/08 (KR);
B63H11/10 (EP,KR);
B63H11/11 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/08] | Title | German: | KOMPAKTES WASSERSTRAHLANTRIEBS UND -LENKSYSTEM | [2005/08] | English: | COMPACT WATER-JET PROPULSION AND STEERING SYSTEM | [2005/08] | French: | SYSTEME COMPACT DE PROPULSION ET DE DIRECTION PAR JET D'EAU | [2005/08] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2004 | Translation filed | 06.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 06.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/08] | 02.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/53] | 14.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR1358662 (TWIN DISC CLUTCH CO) [Y] 4* page 2, column RC, lines 1-3; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US4449944 (BAKER KENNETH R [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 4, line 49 - column 5, line 22; figure 3 *; | [Y]US5244425 (TASAKI HIROSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-8 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 3; figures 3,4,12,13 *; | [Y]US6273768 (BLANCHARD CLARENCE E [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * column 3, lines 12-57; figure - * | International search | [A]SU157611 ; | [A]SU69683 ; | [A]RU2178368 (AKS INVEST AOZT); | [A]US3475912 (ANGIER RICHARD) |