EP1501850 - NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVES FOR TREATING HEPATITIS C VIRUS INFECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENELABS TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 505 Penobscot Drive Redwood City, CA 94063 / US | [2005/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROBERTS, Christopher, Don 1060 Continentals Way Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 02 /
DYATKINA, Natalia, B. 150 Pacchetti Way Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | 03 /
KEICHER, Jesse, D. 818 Fremont Street, Apt. 4 Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | 04 /
LIEHR, Sebastian, Johannes, Reinhard 1721 Woodland Ave., 7 East Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | 05 /
HANSON, Eric Jason 154 Portola Drive, Apt. 2 San Francisco, CA 94131 / US | [2005/05] | Representative(s) | Sexton, Jane Helen J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/05] | Sexton, Jane Helen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03747674.4 | 06.05.2003 | [2005/05] | WO2003US14237 | Priority number, date | US20020378624P | 06.05.2002 Original published format: US 378624 P | US20020392871P | 28.06.2002 Original published format: US 392871 P | [2005/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03093290 | Date: | 13.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/46] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1501850 | Date: | 02.02.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/02 | [2005/05] | CPC: |
C07H19/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07H19/02 (KR);
A61K31/7072 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/20 (EP);
C07H19/052 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NUKLEOSIDDERIVATE ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HEPATITIS-C-VIRUSINFEKTIONEN | [2005/05] | English: | NUCLEOSIDE DERIVATIVES FOR TREATING HEPATITIS C VIRUS INFECTION | [2005/05] | French: | DERIVES NUCLEOSIDIQUES DESTINES AU TRAITEMENT DE L'INFECTION PAR LE VIRUS DE L'HEPATITE C | [2005/05] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2004 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.11.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2004 | Examination requested [2005/05] | 17.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]FR1521076 (MERCK & CO INC) [X] 1,4,7 * examples 8-18 *; | [X]GB1209654 (MERCK & CO INC [US]) [X] 1,4 * examples 1-13 *; | [X]WO9413789 (RIBONETICS GMBH [DE], et al) [X] 1,4 * Fig. 5/5 compound 7 *; | [X]WO0190121 (NOVIRIO PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [KY], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 115 - page 144 *; | [X]WO0192282 (NOVIRIO PHARMACEUTICALS LTD [IT], et al) [X] 1-10 * pages 111-137 *; | [PX]WO02057425 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [PX] 1-10 * Examples 61, 62, 116, 118, 119, 122-124, 127-133, 135-139, 144, 146-148, 151-154 *; | [PX] - MOORE ET AL, BIOCHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 41, no. 47, pages 14066 - 14075, XP002250481 [PX] 1,4 * page 14068 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi026468r | [PX] - DIALPAZ ET AL., EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, (2002), vol. 448, no. 2-3, pages 123 - 131, XP002250482 [PX] 1,4 * P. 124 compounds MeCPA and MeCCPA * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0014-2999(02)01982-9 | [X] - FRANCHETTI P ET AL, "2'-C-Methyl analogues of selective adenosine receptor agonists: Synthesis and binding studies", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1998), vol. 41, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1708 - 1715, XP002189348 [X] 1,4,7 * Scheme 1 p. 1709 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm9707737 | [X] - HARRY-O'KURU ROGERS E ET AL, "2'C-alkylribonucleosides: design, synthesis, and conformation", NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, MARCEL DEKKER, INC, US, (1997), vol. 16, no. 7 - 9, ISSN 0732-8311, pages 1457 - 1460, XP002189347 [X] 1,4-10 * P. 1459 compounds 8, 11, 12 * | [X] - WOLFE ET AL., J. ORG CHEM, (1997), vol. 62, no. 6, pages 1754 - 1759, XP002250483 [X] 1,4-10 * P. 1755 compounds 17, 18, 19 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo961893+ | [X] - WOLFE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1995), vol. 36, no. 42, pages 7611 - 7614, XP002250484 [X] 1,4-10 * P.7612 compounds 5a-5b * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(95)01635-U | [X] - GARRETT ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1972), vol. 94, no. 24, pages 8532 - 8541, XP002250485 [X] 1,4 * p. 8533 fifth compound of table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00779a040 | [X] - BEIGELMAN ET AL., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1987), vol. 166, no. 2, pages 219 - 2132, XP009014837 [X] 1,4 * P. 231 compounds 20-22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0008-6215(87)80059-9 | [X] - MONNERET ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (1992), no. 8, pages 773 - 778, XP001154225 [X] 1,4 * P. 774 compounds 20 and 23 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-1992-26224 | [X] - DUNKEL ET AL., NUCLEOSIDES & NUCLEOTIDES, (1995), vol. 14, no. 3-5, pages 799 - 801, XP009014832 [X] 1,4 * P. 800 compounds 4, 5; P.801 compounds 8, 9 * | [X] - ROSENTHAL ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1970), no. 48, pages 4233 - 4235, XP009014838 [X] 1,4 * page 4233, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)98711-8 |