EP1540725 - METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF A SEMI-CONDUCTOR COMPONENT WITH CONDENSATORS BURIED IN THE SUBSTRATE AND INSULATED COMPONENT LAYER THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2005/24] | SEMI-CONDUCTOR COMPONENT WITH CONDENSATORS BURIED IN THE SUBSTRATE AND INSULATED COMPONENT LAYER THEREOF | ||
[2008/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2008/30] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St. Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOFMANN, Franz Herbergstrasse 25B 80995 München / DE | 02 /
LEHMANN, Volker Geyerspergerstrasse 53 80689 München / DE | 03 /
RISCH, Lothar Tizianstrasse 27 85579 Neubiberg / DE | 04 /
RÖSNER, Wolfgang Sudetenstrasse 23 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | 05 /
SPECHT, Michael Schraudolphstrasse 42 80799 München / DE | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Kindermann, Peter, et al Patentanwälte Kindermann Postfach 10 02 34 85593 Baldham / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Kindermann, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kindermann Patentanwälte Postfach 1330 85627 Grasbrunn / DE | Application number, filing date | 03747835.1 | 13.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003DE03044 | Priority number, date | DE2002142877 | 16.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10242877 | [2005/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004027861 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540725 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1540725 | Date: | 18.06.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/8242, H01L27/108, H01L27/12 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H01L21/84 (EP,US);
H10B12/0387 (EP,US);
H01L27/1203 (EP,US);
H01L29/66181 (EP,US);
H01L29/945 (EP,US);
H10B12/373 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2006/01] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES HALBLEITERBAUTEILS MIT IM SUBSTRAT VERGRABENEN KONDENSATOREN UND DAVON ISOLIERTER BAUELEMENTSCHICHT | [2008/06] | English: | METHOD OF MANUFACTURE OF A SEMI-CONDUCTOR COMPONENT WITH CONDENSATORS BURIED IN THE SUBSTRATE AND INSULATED COMPONENT LAYER THEREOF | [2008/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN COMPOSANT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR POURVU DE CONDENSATEURS ENTERRES DANS LE SUBSTRAT ET D'UNE COUCHE DE COMPOSANT ISOLEE DE CES CONDENSATEURS | [2008/06] |
Former [2005/24] | HALBLEITERBAUTEIL MIT IM SUBSTRAT VERGRABENEN KONDENSATOREN UND DAVON ISOLIERTER BAUELEMENTSCHICHT | ||
Former [2005/24] | SEMI-CONDUCTOR COMPONENT WITH CONDENSATORS BURIED IN THE SUBSTRATE AND INSULATED COMPONENT LAYER THEREOF | ||
Former [2005/24] | COMPOSANT SEMI-CONDUCTEUR POURVU DE CONDENSATEURS ENTERRES DANS LE SUBSTRAT ET D'UNE COUCHE DE COMPOSANT ISOLEE DE CES CONDENSATEURS | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 01.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0235770 ; | [A]JPS63151071 ; | [XY]US5055898 (BEILSTEIN JR KENNETH E [US], et al); | [A]EP0553791 (NEC CORP [JP]); | [A]US5739565 (NAKAMURA YOSHIO [JP], et al); | [Y]WO9925026 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [X]US6306719 (LEE KYU-PIL [KR]); | [A]DE10055711 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]); | [AD]US6441424 (KLOSE HELMUT [US], et al); | [PX]DE10133688 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) |