EP1537252 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOW-PRESSURE CARBURISING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.12.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.10.2009 [2009/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde AG Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Abraham-Lincoln-Strasse 21 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JURMANN, Alexander DI verstorben / DE | [2005/23] | Representative(s) | Zahn, Christoph Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/23] | Zahn, Christoph Linde Aktiengesellschaft, Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | Application number, filing date | 03747994.6 | 09.09.2003 | [2005/23] | WO2003EP10014 | Priority number, date | DE20021042616 | 13.09.2002 Original published format: DE 10242616 | [2005/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004031432 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1537252 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1537252 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/20 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
C23C8/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM UNTERDRUCKAUFKOHLEN | [2005/23] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR LOW-PRESSURE CARBURISING | [2005/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE CARBURATION EN DEPRESSION | [2005/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/23] | 08.07.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.01.2006 | EE | 18.01.2006 | FI | 18.01.2006 | GB | 18.01.2006 | IE | 18.01.2006 | NL | 18.01.2006 | SI | 18.01.2006 | SK | 18.01.2006 | TR | 18.01.2006 | BG | 18.04.2006 | DK | 18.04.2006 | GR | 19.04.2006 | ES | 29.04.2006 | PT | 19.06.2006 | HU | 19.07.2006 | LU | 09.09.2006 | BE | 30.09.2006 | MC | 30.09.2006 | [2009/43] |
Former [2009/03] | CY | 18.01.2006 | |
EE | 18.01.2006 | ||
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
HU | 19.07.2006 | ||
LU | 09.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | EE | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
HU | 19.07.2006 | ||
LU | 09.09.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | EE | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
HU | 19.07.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 18.01.2006 | |
FI | 18.01.2006 | ||
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
GR | 19.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
IT | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
MC | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/31] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
BE | 30.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
GB | 18.01.2006 | ||
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
ES | 29.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
SK | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
DK | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
IE | 18.01.2006 | ||
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
SI | 18.01.2006 | ||
BG | 18.04.2006 | ||
PT | 19.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/45] | FI | 18.01.2006 | |
NL | 18.01.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 18.01.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5064620 (BEURET PIERRE [CH]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, lines 17-53 *; | [A] - MATAMALA G ET AL, "Carburization and decarburization kinetics of iron in CH4 - H2 mixtures between 1000 - 1100 °C", MATERIALS CHEMISTRY AND PHYSICS SWITZERLAND, (198504), vol. 12, no. 4, ISSN 0254-0584, pages 313 - 319, XP002299774 [A] 1-6 * page 314, line 18 - page 315, line 4; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0254-0584(85)90102-6 | [A] - KLÜMPER-WESTKAMP H ET AL, "BESTIMMUNG DES KOHLENSTOFFGEHALTES IN AUFKOHLUNGSFOLIEN", HÄRTEREI - TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MÜNCHEN, DE, (20020901), vol. 57, no. 5, ISSN 0341-101X, pages 364 - 372, XP001140765 [A] 1-6 * Abschnitt 2.1; page 365, column L - column R * | [A] - BAMMIDIPATI SREEKANTH ET AL, "Chemical vapor deposition of carbon on graphite by methane pyrolysis", AICHE J; AICHE JOURNAL NOV 1996 AICHE, NEW YORK, NY, US, (199611), vol. 42, no. 11, pages 3123 - 3132, XP000937830 [A] 4-6 * figure 1 * | [A] - HOFFMANN R ET AL, "PROBLEME DER KINETIK UND DER KEIMBILDUNG BEIM GASNITRIEREN", HÄRTEREI - TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MÜNCHEN, DE, (198305), vol. 38, no. 3, pages 103 - 109, XP009037775 [A] 4 * figure 1 * | [A] - ROEMPLER D ET AL, "KOHLENSTOFF- UND HÄRTEVERLAUF IN DER EINSATZHÄRTUNGSSCHICHT - ZUSATZMODUL FÜR DIFFUSIONSRECHNER", HÄRTEREI - TECHNISCHE MITTEILUNGEN, CARL HANSER VERLAG, MÜNCHEN, DE, (19891101), vol. 44, no. 6, ISSN 0341-101X, pages 360 - 365, XP000163077 [A] 7 * page 360, column L, paragraph 1 * |