EP1553830 - METHOD FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF MICROORGANISMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.12.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/10] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | ||
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states BASF AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DIETSCHE, Frank Dreissig-Morgen-Weg 1 69198 Schriesheim / DE | 02 /
BOUILLO, Nathalie Im Gasseck 21 76532 Baden-Baden / DE | 03 /
KOLTER, Karl Sudetenstr. 1 67117 Limburgerhof / DE | 04 /
HAMERS, Christoph Christoph-Kroewerathstr.170 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2005/29] | Application number, filing date | 03748119.9 | 06.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003EP11017 | Priority number, date | DE2002146625 | 07.10.2002 Original published format: DE 10246625 | [2005/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004032628 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553830 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1553830 | Date: | 23.02.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01N41/04, C02F1/50, A01P1/00 | [2010/36] | CPC: |
A61L2/18 (EP,US);
A01N41/04 (EP,US);
C02F1/50 (EP,US);
Y10S422/905 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/29] | A01N41/04, C02F1/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ABTÖTEN VON MIKROORGANISMEN | [2005/29] | English: | METHOD FOR THE DESTRUCTION OF MICROORGANISMS | [2005/29] | French: | PROCEDES POUR DETRUIRE DES MICRO-ORGANISMES | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 15.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.11.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.02.2011 | CZ | 23.02.2011 | DK | 23.02.2011 | EE | 23.02.2011 | FI | 23.02.2011 | HU | 23.02.2011 | IE | 23.02.2011 | NL | 23.02.2011 | RO | 23.02.2011 | SE | 23.02.2011 | SI | 23.02.2011 | SK | 23.02.2011 | TR | 23.02.2011 | BG | 23.05.2011 | GR | 24.05.2011 | ES | 03.06.2011 | PT | 23.06.2011 | AT | 06.10.2011 | LU | 06.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
TR | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
AT | 06.10.2011 | ||
LU | 06.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
AT | 06.10.2011 | ||
LU | 06.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
AT | 06.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
CZ | 23.02.2011 | ||
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
RO | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SK | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
DK | 23.02.2011 | ||
EE | 23.02.2011 | ||
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
IE | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/39] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
NL | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 23.02.2011 | |
FI | 23.02.2011 | ||
SE | 23.02.2011 | ||
SI | 23.02.2011 | ||
BG | 23.05.2011 | ||
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | SE | 23.02.2011 | |
GR | 24.05.2011 | ||
ES | 03.06.2011 | ||
PT | 23.06.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS54157822 ; | JPS54157822 [ ] (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND) [ ] * page 102; examples 1-4 *; | [A]GB2072508 (MARUZEN OIL CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * page 1, lines 27-50 * * table 1 * * No.4,5,13,14,27,31;; examples 1,3,5 *; | [XD]EP0130789 (TOYO SODA MFG CO LTD [JP]) [XD] 11 * page 1, lines 3-10 * * page 4, lines 20,21 * * examples 2,4-6 * * claims 1,2,9-11 *; | [X]WO9205695 (UNIV FLORIDA [US]) [X] 11 * page 1, lines 9-13 * * example 7 *; | [AD]US6239182 (ZANEVELD LOURENS JAN DIRK [US], et al) [AD] 1-11* the whole document *; | [A]WO0249557 (RUSH PRESBYTERIAN ST LUKE [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [X]WO02072020 (PHYCOGEN INC [US], et al) [X] 11 * page 1, lines 5-9 * * page 2, lines 1-20 * * page 17, lines 14-18 * * page 20, line 22 - page 23, line 29 * * examples 8,11,12 * * claims 6-9,14 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800216), vol. 004, no. 019, Database accession no. (C - 073), & JP54157822 A 19791213 (MITSUBISHI CHEM IND LTD) [X] 11 * abstract * |