EP1532579 - ELECTRONIC LABEL ANTENNA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STORE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS 39 rue de Montigny 95100 Argenteuil / FR | [2009/18] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states STORE ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS 1-7 Rue Henri de France 95870 BEZONS / FR | ||
Former [2005/21] | For all designated states Store Electronic Systems Electronic Shelf Label 1 à 7, rue Henri de France 95870 Bezons / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CATTEAU, Philippe 111 Boulevard Koenig F-92200 Neuilly-Sur-Seine / FR | 02 /
LEGRAS, Pierre 171 route d'Oberhausbergen F-67200 Strasbourg / FR | [2005/21] | Representative(s) | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/21] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 03748169.4 | 16.06.2003 | [2005/21] | WO2003FR01815 | Priority number, date | FR20020007363 | 14.06.2002 Original published format: FR 0207363 | [2005/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO03107267 | Date: | 24.12.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1532579 | Date: | 25.05.2005 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.12.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1532579 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2003 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, H01Q7/00 | [2005/21] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2225 (EP,US);
G06K19/07703 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06Q20/201 (EP,US);
H01Q1/22 (EP,US);
H01Q1/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/21] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE LABEL-ANTENNE | [2005/21] | English: | ELECTRONIC LABEL ANTENNA | [2005/21] | French: | ANTENNE POUR ETIQUETTE ELECTRONIQUE | [2005/21] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/21] | 10.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2008 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.05.2008 | 21.05.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.05.2008 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 12.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | IE | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | LU | 16.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/31] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
LU | 16.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
LU | 16.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/48] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/43] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/39] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/34] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
IE | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]US6118426 (ALBERT JONATHAN D [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8* column 13, line 65 - column 14, line 61; figure 6A *; | [X]US2001020935 (GELBMAN ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1-4,6,9 * page 7, paragraph 2 - paragraph 8; figure 4 * * page 8, paragraph 9 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * |