EP1556897 - THERMAL-CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE PACKAGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | Refusal of application | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Co., Ltd. No. 8, Li-Hsin Rd. 6 Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu, 300-77 / TW | [N/P] |
Former [2009/33] | For all designated states Taiwan Semiconductor Manufacturing Co., Ltd. No.8 Li-Hsin Rd 6 Science-Based Industrial Park Hsin-Chu, 300-77 / TW | ||
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WYLAND, Chris 1109 McKay Drive, M/S-41SJ San Jose, CA 95131 / US | [2005/30] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2009/30] | van Westenbrugge, Andries, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Postbus 29720 2502 LS Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/14] | van der Veer, Johannis Leendert, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/01] | Pennings, Johannes, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [2005/30] | Eleveld, Koop Jan Philips Intellectual Property & Standards, P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 03748414.4 | 04.10.2003 | [2005/30] | WO2003IB04370 | Priority number, date | US20020279703 | 24.10.2002 Original published format: US 279703 | [2005/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004038795 | Date: | 06.05.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1556897 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/373 | [2005/30] | CPC: |
H01L23/49822 (EP,US);
H01L23/373 (KR);
H01L23/3733 (EP,US);
H01L23/3737 (EP,US);
H05K1/0203 (EP,US);
H05K7/20 (KR);
H01L2224/05599 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/85399 (EP,US);
H01L23/4334 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H05K1/0366 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/05599, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/85399, H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45015, H01L2924/207 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12041, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/15311, H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) (-) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE MIT THERMISCH LEITENDEM SUBSTRAT | [2005/30] | English: | THERMAL-CONDUCTIVE SUBSTRATE PACKAGE | [2005/30] | French: | BOITIER DE SUBSTRAT THERMO-CONDUCTEUR | [2005/30] | Entry into regional phase | 24.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.05.2005 | Examination requested [2005/30] | 11.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2014/17] | 22.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.11.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2014/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5066368 (PASQUALONI ANTHONY M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-10,12 * column 3, lines 24-43; figure 1 * [A] 6,11; | [X]US5500555 (LEY TOM [US]) [X] 1,3,6,7,11,12 * column 4, lines 1-65; figures 3,4 *; | [XA]JPS6465895 | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890627), vol. 013, no. 280, Database accession no. (E - 779), & JP01065895 A 19890313 (HITACHI CABLE LTD) [X] 1,7,12 * abstract * [A] 4,9 | Examination | WO0226479 | EP1039537 | US2002156189 | by applicant | US6121680 | US5960863 | US5309321 | US5500555 | US5066368 | JPH065895 | WO0226479 | EP1039537 |