EP1528933 - PHARMACEUTICAL ANTI-TNF-ALPHA ANTIBODY FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.09.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 06.06.2018 [2018/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Biotechnology Ltd Clarendon House 2, Church Street HM 11 Hamilton / BM | [2014/01] |
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Abbott Biotechnology Ltd. Clarendon House, 2 Church Street HM 11 Hamilton / BM | ||
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states Abbott Biotechnology Ltd. Clarendon House, 2 Church Street HM 11 Hamilton / BM | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUSE, Hans-Juergen Marie-Curie-Weg 1 68647 Biblis / DE | 02 /
BAUST, Lisa Goethestr. 15a 67063 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
DICKES, Michael Schafergasse 58 67127 Rodersheim-Gronau / DE | [2006/21] |
Former [2005/19] | 01 /
KRAUSE, Hans-Juergen Dieselstrasse 33 67551 Worms / DE | ||
02 /
BAUST, Lisa Stamitzstrasse 8 68167 Mannheim / DE | |||
03 /
DICKES, Michael Schafergasse 58 67127 Rodersheim-Gronau / DE | Representative(s) | König, Gregor Sebastian, et al König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 11 09 46 40509 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/08] |
Former [2012/18] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/19] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach & Partner (GbR) Patentanwälte Sternwartstrasse 4 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03748439.1 | 15.08.2003 | [2005/19] | WO2003IB04502 | Priority number, date | US20020222140 | 16.08.2002 Original published format: US 222140 | [2005/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004016286 | Date: | 26.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1528933 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1528933 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K9/19, A61K47/26 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
A61K39/39591 (EP,US);
A61K39/395 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K47/02 (US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K47/12 (US);
A61K47/22 (US);
A61K47/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61K9/19 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P1/18 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/04 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/241 (EP,US);
A61K2039/505 (US);
C07K2317/21 (EP,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,US);
C07K2317/92 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Title | German: | PHARMEZEUTISCHE ANTI-TNF-ALPHA ANTIKÖRPER FORMULIERUNG | [2005/19] | English: | PHARMACEUTICAL ANTI-TNF-ALPHA ANTIBODY FORMULATION | [2005/19] | French: | FORMULATION PHARMACEUTIQUE D'ANTICORPS ANTI-TNF-ALPHA | [2005/19] | Entry into regional phase | 11.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 15.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 20.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 26.08.2011 | Observations by third parties | 25.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2016 | Observations by third parties | Appeal following examination | 25.02.2011 | Appeal received | 29.04.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.05.2011 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Divisional application(s) | EP10182598.2 / EP2363144 | EP10182610.5 / EP2359856 | EP10182619.6 / EP2361637 | EP10182625.3 / EP2363145 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | 02
01.02.2013
18.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG) Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1 22767 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | 03
04.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | 04
01.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Bird, William Edward Patentive Prinz-Georg-Strasse 91 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
01.02.2013
18.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG) Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1 22767 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
03
04.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
04
01.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Bird, William Edward Patentive Prinz-Georg-Strasse 91 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2014/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
01.02.2013
18.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG) Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1 22767 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Wittkopp, Alexander Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
03
04.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Theatinerstrasse 16 80333 München / DE | |||
04
01.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Bird, William Edward Patentive Prinz-Georg-Strasse 91 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2013/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Storz, Dr. Ulrich c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
01.02.2013
18.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG) Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1 22767 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Wittkopp, Alexander Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
03
04.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Pohlman, Sandra M. Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 80333 München / DE | |||
04
01.02.2013
14.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Bird, William Edward Patentive Prinz-Georg-Strasse 91 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | |||
Former [2013/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.2013
Storz, Dr. Ulrich c/o Michalski Hüttermann Patentanwälte Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
02
01.02.2013
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG) Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1 22767 Hamburg / DE Opponent's representative Wittkopp, Alexander Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Jungfernstieg 38 20354 Hamburg / DE | |||
03
04.02.2013
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD. 5 Basel Street Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL Opponent's representative Greiner, Elisabeth Df-mp Fünf Höfe Theatinerstraße 16 DE-80333 München / DE | |||
04
01.02.2013
ADMISSIBLE Bird, William Edward Patentive Prinz-Georg-Strasse 91 40479 Düsseldorf / DE | 08.03.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.01.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.09.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 13.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 21.08.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/43] | Appeal following opposition | 17.12.2015 | Appeal received No. T2334/15 | 23.02.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.09.2016 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2016/38] | 24.01.2017 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/04] | 21.08.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 02.05.2012 | LI | 02.05.2012 | CY | 15.08.2017 | [2018/23] |
Former [2017/51] | CH | 02.05.2012 | |
LI | 02.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9704801 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [XY]WO9856418 (GENENTECH INC [US]); | [X]US5945098 (SARNO MARIA ERLINDA C [US], et al); | [XY]US6024938 (CORBO DIANE C [US], et al); | [DY]US6090382 (SALFELD JOCHEN G [US], et al); | [X]US6171586 (LAM XANTHE M [US], et al); | [XY]WO0147554 (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [XY]EP1174148 (YAMANOUCHI PHARMA CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO0212502 (CENTOCOR INC [US]); | EP1254666 [ ] (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | Examination | WO9729131 | - CARPENTER-JF ET AL., "Rational design of stable lyophilized protein formulations: some practical advice", PHARM RES, (199708), vol. 14, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1023/A:1012180707283, page 969-75, XP002303280 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1012180707283 | - WANG-W, "Instability, stabilization, and formulation of liquid protein pharmaceuticals", INT J PHARM, (19990820), vol. 185, no. 2, page 129-88, XP002616539 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(99)00152-0 | - AKERS-MJ ET AL., Development and Manufacture of Protein Pharmaceuticals (Pharmaceutical Biotechnology): chapter 2 Formulation Development of Protein Dosage Forms, NEW YORK, KLUWER ACADEMIC/PLENUM PUBLISHER, (20020630), XP001537612 | - BARRERA P ET AL, "Effects of treatment with a fully human anti-tumour necrosis factor alpha monoclonal antibody on the local and systemic homeostasis of interleukin 1 and TNFalpha in patients with rheumatoid arthritis.", ANNALS OF THE RHEUMATIC DISEASES JUL 2001 LNKD- PUBMED:11406520, (200107), vol. 60, no. 7, doi:doi:10.1136/ard.60.7.660, ISSN 0003-4967, pages 660 - 669, XP009131336 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1136/ard.60.7.660 | - HARRIS REED J ET AL, "Commercial manufacturing scale formulation and analytical characterization of therapeutic recombinant antibodies", DRUG DEVELOPMENT RESEARCH, (200403), vol. 61, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1002/ddr.10344, ISSN 0272-4391, pages 137 - 154, XP002649544 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ddr.10344 | - WANG WEI ET AL, "Antibody structure, instability, and formulation.", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES JAN 2007 LNKD- PUBMED:16998873, (200701), vol. 96, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1002/jps.20727, ISSN 0022-3549, pages 1 - 26, XP009084505 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.20727 | by applicant | EP0218868 | EP0230574 | EP0374510 | WO9104054 | EP0453898 | WO9203145 | WO9211383 | EP0186833 | WO9216553 | WO9216221 | WO9217583 | WO9311793 | US5231024 | EP0260610 | WO9319751 | EP0585705 | WO9408609 | EP0614984 | WO9420139 | WO9520978 | US6015557 | US6090382 | WO0050079 | US6177077 | US2001004456 | US6258562 | WO0149321 | US2001016195 | US2001026801 | US6379666 | US6419934 | US6419944 | US6423321 | US6428787 | US20020397275 | other | US6090382 | US6258562 | - REGISTRY, Chemical Abstracts Service, Columbus, Ohio, US, Database accession no. 331731-18-1, URL: STN, XP055297934 |