EP1643099 - ELECTRIC POWER SUPPLY EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KAWASAKI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1 Higashikawasaki-cho, 3-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe shi, Hyogo 650-8670 / JP | [2006/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKO, Masaaki 2-22-1-104, Izumi-dai 7-chome, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-1141 / JP | 02 /
OTA, Hideaki 21-12, Minami-Kasugaoka 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0046 / JP | [2006/14] | Representative(s) | Piésold, Alexander James, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/14] | Piésold, Alexander James, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 03748708.9 | 06.10.2003 | [2006/14] | WO2003JP12754 | Priority number, date | JP20030169219 | 13.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003169219 | [2006/14] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004111412 | Date: | 23.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1643099 | Date: | 05.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02C6/00, F02C3/22, F02C9/48 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
F02M21/0245 (EP,US);
F02C3/22 (EP,US);
F02C6/00 (EP,US);
F02C9/48 (EP,US);
F02D19/022 (EP,US);
F02D19/023 (EP,US);
F02D19/027 (EP,US);
F02D19/029 (EP,US);
F02D29/06 (EP,US);
F02M21/0215 (EP,US);
F05D2270/05 (EP,US);
F23N2221/10 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/14] | F02C3/22, F02C6/00, F01K23/10, F02M21/02, F02D29/06, F23K5/00, F23N1/00, C10L3/00, C10J1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMERZEUGUNGSEINRICHTUNG | [2010/34] | English: | ELECTRIC POWER SUPPLY EQUIPMENT | [2006/14] | French: | EQUIPEMENT D'ALIMENTATION ELECTRIQUE | [2006/14] |
Former [2006/14] | STROMZUFUHREINRICHTUNG | Entry into regional phase | 29.12.2005 | Translation filed | 29.12.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.12.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.12.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.12.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.12.2005 | Examination requested [2006/14] | 21.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 12.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.12.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO9428298 (KURKI SUONIO EERO JUHO ILMARI [FI]) [Y] 4,5 * abstract *; | [X]DE29714887U (MOTOREN WERKE MANNHEIM AG [DE]) [X] 1-3,7-9 * page 2, line 23 - page 6, line 32; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9807974 (ABB POWERMAN AB [SE], et al) [A] 1* page 3, line 5 - page 3, line 27; figure 1 *; | [XY]US6393821 (PRABHU EDAN [US]) [X] 1-3,7-9,12,13 * column 4, line 21 - column 8, line 65; figures 1,2 * [Y] 4,5; | [X]JP2003106172 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [X] 1-3,7-9 * abstract *; | [X]JP2003120419 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6-9 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JPH10310783 (EBARA CORP); | [Y]JP2003120419 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003106172 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003065084 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND); | [Y]JPS60262890 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD); | [A]US5953899 (RAO ASHOK D [US], et al); | [A]JP2002326071 (CHUGOKU ELECTRIC POWER) | by applicant | JP2003074372 | WO9428298 | US6393821 |