EP1527028 - TEMPERABLE HIGH SHADING PERFORMANCE COATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cardinal CG Company Suite 200, 775 Prairie Center Drive Eden Prairie Minnesota 55344 / US | [2018/37] |
Former [2005/18] | For all designated states Cardinal CG Company Suite 200, 775 Prairie Center Drive Eden Prairie, Minnesota 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRISKO, Annette 905 Hanksfield Place Prairie du Sac, WI 53578 / US | 02 /
PFAFF, Gary 32251 Robin Hollow Road Cazenovia, WI 53924 / US | [2005/18] | Representative(s) | Hansson Thyresson AB PO Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/37] | Persson, Albin, et al Hansson Thyresson AB Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Persson, Albin, et al Hansson Thyresson Patentbyra AB Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2005/18] | Boberg, Nils Gunnar Erik, et al Hansson Thyresson Patentbyrä AB Box 73 201 20 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 03749000.0 | 31.07.2003 | [2005/18] | WO2003US24132 | Priority number, date | US20020400292P | 31.07.2002 Original published format: US 400292 P | [2005/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004011382 | Date: | 05.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1527028 | Date: | 04.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1527028 | Date: | 12.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/36 | [2005/18] | CPC: |
C03C17/3615 (EP,US);
C03C17/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/3618 (EP,US);
C03C17/3626 (EP,US);
C03C17/3639 (EP,US);
C03C17/3642 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/37] |
Former [2005/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | WÄRMEHÄRTBARE BESCHICHTUNGEN MIT HOHEM SCHATTIERUNGSVERMÖGEN | [2005/18] | English: | TEMPERABLE HIGH SHADING PERFORMANCE COATINGS | [2005/18] | French: | REVETEMENTS A PERFORMANCE D'OMBRAGE ELEVEE TREMPABLES | [2005/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/18] | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.03.2018 | 13.03.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 10   M06   Fee paid on   27.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.07.2003 | AT | 12.09.2018 | CY | 12.09.2018 | CZ | 12.09.2018 | DK | 12.09.2018 | EE | 12.09.2018 | ES | 12.09.2018 | FI | 12.09.2018 | IT | 12.09.2018 | MC | 12.09.2018 | NL | 12.09.2018 | RO | 12.09.2018 | SE | 12.09.2018 | SI | 12.09.2018 | SK | 12.09.2018 | TR | 12.09.2018 | BG | 12.12.2018 | GR | 13.12.2018 | PT | 12.01.2019 | [2021/33] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CY | 12.09.2018 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
TR | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
MC | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
DK | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
PT | 12.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 12.09.2018 | |
CZ | 12.09.2018 | ||
EE | 12.09.2018 | ||
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
SK | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | CZ | 12.09.2018 | |
ES | 12.09.2018 | ||
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
RO | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
IT | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
NL | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | ES | 12.09.2018 | |
FI | 12.09.2018 | ||
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | FI | 12.09.2018 | |
SE | 12.09.2018 | ||
BG | 12.12.2018 | ||
GR | 13.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 12.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [E]WO03074441 (CARDINAL CG CO [US], et al) [E] 1-49 * page 23, line 19 - page 38, line 17; figures 4-9 *; | [E]US2003148115 (GLENN DARIN [US], et al) [E] 1-49 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0051] *; | [PA]EP1329307 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-49 * figure -; example -; claim - *; | [A]WO0226488 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]US2002045037 (BOIRE PHILIPPE [FR], et al) [A] 1-49 * example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0847965 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1-49 * example -; claim - *; | [A]WO9748649 (CARDINAL IG CO [US]) [A] 1-49 * example -; claim - * | Examination | US2003049464 | US5948538 | by applicant | US5424130 | US5874701 | US5853866 | US5961843 | US6139803 | US6191062 | US5939194 | US6013372 | US6090489 | US6210779 | US5616532 | US19970868542 | US19950572766 | US20000599301 | US19980123032 | US19980087662 |