EP1535412 - OPTICAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM EMPLOYING ERBIUM-DOPED OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS AND RAMAN AMPLIFIERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Red Sky Subsea Ltd New Saxon House 1 Winsford Way Boreham Interchange Chelmsford Essex CM2 5PD / GB | [2006/17] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Red Sky Systems, Inc. 115 Corporate Boulevard So.Plainfield, NJ 07080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EVANGELIDES, Stephen, G., Jr. 62 Dartmouth St. Red Bank, NJ 07701 / US | 02 /
NAGEL, Jonathan, A. 416 Clinton, St. Brooklyn, NY 11031 / US | 03 /
YOUNG, Mark, K. 4 Old Ridge Road Monmouth Jonction, NJ 08852 / US | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Keith W Nash & Co Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03749087.7 | 20.08.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003US26107 | Priority number, date | US20020404610P | 20.08.2002 Original published format: US 404610 P | US20020313965 | 06.12.2002 Original published format: US 313965 | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004019075 | Date: | 04.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1535412 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.08.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/12 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
H04B10/2935 (EP,US);
H04B10/2916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/49] |
Former [2005/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHES ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM MIT ERBIUMDOTIERTEN OPTISCHEN VERSTÄRKERN UND RAMAN-VERSTÄRKERN | [2005/22] | English: | OPTICAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM EMPLOYING ERBIUM-DOPED OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS AND RAMAN AMPLIFIERS | [2005/22] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION OPTIQUE UTILISANT DES AMPLIFICATEURS OPTIQUES DOPES A L'ERBIUM ET DES AMPLIFICATEURS RAMAN | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 26.03.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1225666 (JDS UNIPHASE INC [US]) [X] 1,13,14,21-24 * paragraph [0034] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0041] * * figure 1 ** figures 2a-2d *; | [PX]EP1298820 (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [PX] 1-4,8,9,13-17,21,22 * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0028] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0030] * * figure 1 * | International search | [YP]US2003030891 (SRIKANT V [US], et al); | [YE]US6633712 (DENNIS MICHAEL L [US], et al); | [Y]US6141468 (KIDORF HOWARD DAVID [US], et al); | [YP]US2003077032 (DULING IRL N [US]) | [Y] - AGRAWAL G.P., Fiber-Optic Communication Systems, 3rd Edition, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, INC.I, (20020528), page 229 |