EP1542792 - CHARGING AND CAPTURE OF PARTICLES IN CORONAS IRRADIATED BY IN-SITU X-RAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.05.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Washington University in St. Louis One Brookings Drive St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | [2005/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BISWAS, Pratim 1033 Speckledwood Manor Court Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | 02 /
NAMIKI, Norikazu, Dept. of Chem. & Chemical Eng. Kanazawa Univ., 2-40-20, Kodatsuno, Kanazawa Ishkawa / JP | 03 /
KULKARNI, Pramod 6429 Cates Avenue, 2E St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | [2006/37] |
Former [2005/25] | 01 /
BISWAS, Pratim 1033 Speckledwood Manor Court Chesterfield, MO 63017 / US | ||
02 /
NAMIKI, Norikazu B-3, 2-7-25 Wakunami Kanazawa, Ishikawa Japan, 920-0953 / JP | |||
03 /
KULKARNI, Pramod 6429 Cates Avenue, 2E St. Louis, MO 63130 / US | Representative(s) | Gill, Stephen Charles Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/25] | Gill, Stephen Charles Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 03749138.8 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/25] | WO2003US26688 | Priority number, date | US20020237268 | 30.08.2002 Original published format: US 237268 | [2005/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004021403 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1542792 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/08, B03C3/011 | [2005/25] | CPC: |
B01J19/125 (EP,US);
B01J19/088 (EP,US);
G21K5/02 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0809 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0828 (EP,US);
B01J2219/083 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0841 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0849 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0869 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/25] | Title | German: | LADEN UND EINFANGEN VON PARTIKELN IN MIT IN-SITU-RÖNTGENSTRAHLEN BESTRAHLTEN KORONAS | [2005/25] | English: | CHARGING AND CAPTURE OF PARTICLES IN CORONAS IRRADIATED BY IN-SITU X-RAYS | [2005/25] | French: | CHARGEMENT ET CAPTURE DE PARTICULES DANS DES COURONNES EXPOSEES A DES RAYONS X IN SITU | [2005/25] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/25] | 25.05.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/25] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   21.09.2005 | 31.08.2007 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE376096 (GELSENKIRCHENER BERGWERKS AG) [X] 1-31 * claim 1 *; | [A]US4215682 (DAVIS CHARLES I [US], et al) [A] 1-31* column 4, line 57 - line 59 *; | [X]US4695358 (MIZUNO AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1,18,30 * column 1, line 59 - line 64 *; | [X]EP0577149 (EBARA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,18,30 * claim 6 * | International search | [A]US3984296 (RICHARDS JOHN R); | [A]US4070163 (KOLB ALAN C, et al); | [A]US6149717 (SATYAPAL SUNITA [US], et al) |