EP1540330 - METHOD AND STAINING REAGENTS FOR STAINING HEMATOLOGY SAMPLES IN AN AUTOMATED STAINING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.12.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELITechGroup Inc. 370 West 1700 South Logan, UT 84321 / US | [2015/50] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states WESCOR, INC. 459 South Main Street Logan, Utah 84321 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STOKES, Barry, O. 132 W. 1260 South Logan, Utah 84321 / US | 02 /
NELSON, Patti, A. 8343 South Highway 165 Paradise, UT 84328-9700 / US | 03 /
BRADSHAW, Gary, D. 175 W. 700 South Wellsville, UT 84339-9580 / US | [2006/23] |
Former [2005/24] | 01 /
STOKES, Barry, O. 130 W. 1260 South Logan, UT 84321-6294 / US | ||
02 /
NELSON, Patti, A. 8343 South Highway 165 Paradise, UT 84328-9700 / US | |||
03 /
BRADSHAW, Gary, D. 175 W. 700 South Wellsville, UT 84339-9580 / US | Representative(s) | Weisse, Renate, et al Bleibtreustraße 38 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Weisse, Renate, et al Bleibtreustrasse 38 DE-10623 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Weisse, Renate Dr., et al Weisse & Wolgast Bökenbuschstr. 41 42555 Velbert / DE | Application number, filing date | 03749201.4 | 29.08.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003US27030 | Priority number, date | US20020232474 | 29.08.2002 Original published format: US 232474 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004020995 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1540330 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N31/00, G01N35/00 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
G01N1/30 (EP,US);
G01N1/312 (EP,US);
G01N2035/00495 (EP,US);
Y10S436/80 (EP,US);
Y10T436/10 (EP,US);
Y10T436/107497 (EP,US);
Y10T436/108331 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/111666 (EP,US);
Y10T436/112499 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND FÄRBEMITTEL ZUM FÄRBEN VON HÄMATOLOGIEPROBEN IN EINER AUTOMATISIERTEN FÄRBEVORRICHTUNG | [2005/24] | English: | METHOD AND STAINING REAGENTS FOR STAINING HEMATOLOGY SAMPLES IN AN AUTOMATED STAINING APPARATUS | [2005/24] | French: | PROCEDE ET REACTIFS DE COLORATION POUR COLORER DES ECHANTILLONS HEMATOLOGIQUES DANS UN APPAREIL DE COLORATION AUTOMATIQUE | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 26.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/03] | 15.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2022/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.09.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 27.09.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2018 | 16   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2018 | 31.08.2019 | 17   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2019 | 31.08.2020 | 18   M06   Fee paid on   08.10.2020 | 31.08.2021 | 19   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2402204 (TRAN THAI THANH [FR]) [X] 24-32* page 1, line 21 - page 3, line 10 *; | [XA]US4363632 (CUSTARD ELIZABETH, et al) [X] 24-40 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 4 * [A] 1-23; | [XY]US4595524 (YIP KIN F [US], et al) [X] 24-40 * column 1, line 57 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 30 * * column 3, line 56 - line 68 * [Y] 1-23; | [DY]US5009185 (STOKES BARRY O [US], et al) [DY] 1-23 * column 5, line 52 - column 6, line 57 *; | [Y]WO9963324 (CELLAVISION AB [SE], et al) [Y] 1-23 * figures 1,2; claims 1-22 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 21 *; | [XY] - MARSHALL P N ET AL, "Microspectrophotometric studies of Romanowsky stained blood cells. III. The action of methylene blue and azure B.", STAIN TECHNOLOGY JAN 1984, (198401), vol. 59, no. 1, ISSN 0038-9153, pages 17 - 36, XP008083479 [X] 24-40 * Materials and Methods: stain composition and staining technique pages 18-19 * [Y] 1-23 | International search | [Y]US4595524 (YIP KIN F [US], et al); | [Y]US5009185 (STOKES BARRY O [US], et al); | [Y]US6344337 (MANSFIELD LINDA S [US], et al) | Examination | US3995022 | by applicant | FR2402204 | US4363632 | - PAUL N. MARSHALL; W. GALBRAITH, STAIN TECHNOLOG, (198401), vol. 59, no. 1, pages 17 - 36 |