EP1572943 - CIRCULAR NUCLEIC ACID VECTORS, AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, CY, HU, SE, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Board of Trustees of The Leland S. Stanford Junior University 900 Welch Road, Suite 350 Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US | [2005/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAY, Mark, A. 565 Casita Way Los Altos, CA 94305 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Zhi-Ying 2211 Latham Street 116 Mountain View, CA 94041 / US | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Heaton, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [2007/17] | Heaton, Joanne Marie Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [2005/37] | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 03749280.8 | 28.08.2003 | [2005/37] | WO2003US27294 | Priority number, date | US20020407344P | 29.08.2002 Original published format: US 407344 P | US20030463672P | 16.04.2003 Original published format: US 463672 P | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004020605 | Date: | 11.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1572943 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1572943 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/02, C12N15/00 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
C12N15/64 (EP,US);
A61K48/005 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
C12N15/70 (EP,US);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
C12N2800/108 (EP,US);
C12N2800/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2005/37] | C12N1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/17] |
Former [2005/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ZIRKULÄRE NUKLEINSÄUREVEKTOREN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2005/37] | English: | CIRCULAR NUCLEIC ACID VECTORS, AND METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2005/37] | French: | VECTEURS CIRCULAIRES D'ACIDES NUCLEIQUES ET PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2005 | Search fee paid | 02.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 18.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2009 | Invitation to provide information on prior art | 18.11.2009 | Reply to the invitation to provide information on prior art | 08.07.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 31.08.2010 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 08.11.2010 | Appeal received No. T0342/11 | 07.01.2011 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.05.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | 23.05.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.06.2014 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | EP14168527.1 / EP2801614 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.08.2003 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BE | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | IT | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | IE | 28.08.2015 | LU | 28.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/37] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 28.08.2015 | ||
LU | 28.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 28.08.2015 | ||
LU | 28.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 28.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 28.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 28.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 28.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 28.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9409127 (US HEALTH [US]) [X] 1-3,5-12,16-27,30-34 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1035208 (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) [X] 1-3,5-16 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO02083889 (IMP COLLEGE INNOVATIONS LTD [GB], et al) [PX] 1-13,16-21,24-36 * the whole document *; | [X] - DARQUET A-M ET AL, "MINICIRCLE: AN IMPROVED DNA MOLECULE FOR IN VITRO AND IN VIVO GENE TRANSFER", GENE THERAPY, MACMILLAN PRESS LTD., BASINGSTOKE, GB, (199902), vol. 6, no. 2, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 209 - 218, XP001000924 [X] 1-3,5-13,16-21,24-27,30-34,14,15,22,23 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300816 | [X] - BIGGER B W ET AL, "AN ARAC-CONTROLLED BACTERIAL CRE EXPRESSION SYSTEM TO PRODUCE DNA MICROCIRCLE VECTORS FOR NUCLEAR AND MITOCHONDRIAL GENE THERAPY", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (20010622), vol. 276, no. 25, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 23018 - 23027, XP001121110 [X] 1-3,5-13,16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M010873200 | [T] - CHEN ZHI-YING ET AL, "Improved production and purification of minicircle DNA vector free of plasmid bacterial sequences and capable of persistent transgene expression in vivo", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, (200501), vol. 16, no. 1, ISSN 1043-0342, pages 126 - 131, XP002431639 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/hum.2005.16.126 | [T] - CHEN Z Y ET AL, "Silencing of episomal transgene expression by plasmid bacterial DNA elements in vivo", GENE THERAPY, (200405), vol. 11, no. 10, ISSN 0969-7128, pages 856 - 864, XP002431640 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3302231 | International search | [X] - DARQUET A.M. ET AL., "Minicircle an improved DNA molecule for in vitro and in vivo gene transfer", GENE THERAPY, (199902), vol. 6, no. 2, pages 209 - 218, XP001000924 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.gt.3300816 | [X] - BIGGER B.W. ET AL., "An araC-controlled bacterial cre expression system to produce DNA minicircle vectors for nuclear and mitochondrial gene therapy", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20010622), vol. 276, no. 25, pages 23018 - 23027, XP001121110 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M010873200 | [A] - CHEN Z.Y. ET AL., "Minicircle DNA vectors devoid of bacterial DNA result in persistent and high-level transgene expression in vivo", MOLECULAR THERAPY, (200309), vol. 8, no. 3, pages 495 - 500, XP002292220 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1525-0016(03)00168-0 | Examination | - THORPE H.M. ET AL, "In vitro site-specific integration of bacteriophage DNA catalyzed by a recombinase of the resolvase/invertase family", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1998), vol. 95, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 5505 - 5510, XP002157128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.95.10.5505 | - GROTH A.C. ET AL, "A phage integrase directs efficient site-specific integration in human cells", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA,, WASHINGTON, DC.; US, (20000523), vol. 97, no. 11, pages 5995 - 6000, XP002221880 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.090527097 | - THYAGARAJAN B. ET AL, "Site-specific genomic integration in mammalian cells mediated by phage phiC31 integrase", MOLECULAR AND CELLULAR BIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, US, (20010601), vol. 21, no. 12, pages 3926 - 3934, XP002231556 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/MCB.21.12.3926-3934.2001 | by applicant | US5922687 | US5985847 | WO02083889 | WO2011000092 | - THORPE ET AL., PNAS, (1998), vol. 95, pages 5505 - 551 0 | - GROTH ET AL., PNAS 97, (1997), vol. 11, pages 5995 - 6000 | - DARQUET ET AL., Gene Therapy, MACMILLAN PRESS, (199902), vol. 6 | - WOLFF ET AL., "Direct Gene Transfer Into Mouse Muscle In Vivo", SCIENCE, (199003), vol. 247, doi:doi:10.1126/science.1690918, pages 1465 - 1468, XP000293057 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1690918 | - HICKMAN ET AL., "Gene Expression Following Direct Injection of DNA Into Liver", HUM. GEN. THER., (199412), vol. 5, pages 1477 - 1483 | - ACSADI ET AL., "Direct Gene Transfer and Expression Into Rat Heart In Vivo", NEW BIOL., (199101), vol. 3, pages 71 - 81 | - DIJKEMA ET AL., EMBO J., (1985), vol. 4, page 761 | - GORMAN ET AL., PROC. NAT'1 ACAD. SCI USA, (1982), vol. 79, page 6777 | - BOSHART ET AL., CELL, (1985), vol. 41, page 521 | - LEVY-HOLTZMAN ,R.; SCHECHTER, BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA, (1995), vol. 1263, pages 96 - 98 | - PRESNAIL, J.K.; M.A. HOY, EXP. APPL. ACAROL., (1994), vol. 18, pages 301 - 308 | - GODDARD ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1997), vol. 4, pages 1231 - 1236 | - GORMAN ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1997), vol. 4, pages 983 - 992 | - CHADWICK ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1997), vol. 4, pages 937 - 942 | - GOKHALE ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1997), vol. 4, pages 1289 - 1299 | - GAO; HUANG, GENE THERAPY, (1995), vol. 2, pages 710 - 722 | - MONAHAN ET AL., GENE THERAPY, (1997), vol. 4, pages 40 - 49 | - ONODERA ET AL., BLOOD, (1998), vol. 91, pages 30 - 36 | - FINGL ET AL., The Pharmacological Basis of Therapeutics, (1975), page L | - LIEBER ET AL., "Elimination of hepatitis C virus RNA in infected human hepatocytes by adenovirus-mediated expression of ribozymes", J VIROL., (199612), vol. 70, no. 12, pages 8782 - 91, XP002200431 | - LIEBER ET AL., "Related Articles Adenovirus-mediated expression of ribozymes in mice", J VIROL., (199605), vol. 70, no. 5, pages 3153 - 8 | - TANG ET AL., "Intravenous angiotensinogen antisense in AAV-based vector decreases hypertension", AM J PHYSIOL., (199912), vol. 277, no. 6, pages H2392 - 9 | - HORSTER ET AL., "Recombinant AAV-2 harboring gfp-antisense/ribozyme fusion sequences monitor transduction, gene expression, and show anti-HIV-1 efficacy", GENE THER., (199907), vol. 6, no. 7, pages 1231 - 8 | - PHILLIPS ET AL., "Prolonged reduction of high blood pressure with an in vivo, nonpathogenic, adeno-associated viral vector delivery of AT1-R mRNA antisense", HYPERTENSION, (199701), vol. 29, no. 1, pages 374 - 80 | - GROTH, A.C.; OLIVARES, E.C.; THYAGARAJAN, B.; CALOS, M.P, "A phage integrase directs efficient site-specific integration in human cells", PROC NATL ACAD SCI U S A, (2000), vol. 97, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.090527097, pages 5995 - 6000, XP002221880 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.090527097 | - CHEN, Z.Y. ET AL., "Linear DNAs concatemerize in vivo and result in sustained transgene expression in mouse liver", MOL THER, (2001), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1006/mthe.2001.0278, pages 403 - 410, XP002292302 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mthe.2001.0278 | - MIAO, C.H. ET AL., "Inclusion of the hepatic locus control region, an intron, and untranslated region increases and stabilizes hepatic factor IX gene expression in vivo but not in vitro", MOL THER, (2000), vol. 1, pages 522 - 532, XP002550493 | - MIAO, C.H.; THOMPSON, A.R.; LOEB, K.; YE, X, "Long-term and therapeutic-level hepatic gene expression of human factor IX after naked plasmid transfer in vivo", MOL THER, (2001), vol. 3, doi:doi:10.1006/mthe.2001.0333, pages 947 - 957, XP055143164 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/mthe.2001.0333 | - ZHANG, G.; BUDKER, V.; WOLFF, J.A, "High levels of foreign gene expression in hepatocytes after tail vein injections of naked plasmid DNA", HUM GENE THER, (1999), vol. 10, doi:doi:10.1089/10430349950017734, pages 1735 - 1737, XP002201559 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/10430349950017734 | - LIU, F.; SONG, Y.; LIU, D, "Hydrodynamics-based transformation in animals by systemic administration of plasmid DNA", GENE THER, (1999), vol. 6, pages 1258 - 1266 | - YANT, S.R. ET AL., "Somatic integration and long-term transgene expression in normal and haemophilic mice using a DNA transposon system", NAT GENET, (2000), vol. 25, doi:doi:10.1038/75568, pages 35 - 41, XP002946960 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/75568 | - GAL, D. ET AL., "Direct myocardial transformation in two animal models. Evaluation of parameters affecting gene expression and percutaneous gene delivery", LAB INVEST, (1993), vol. 68, pages 18 - 25 | - WOLFF, J.A.; LUDTKE, J.J.; ACSADI, G.; WILLIAMS, P.; JANI, A., "Long-term persistence of plasmid DNA and foreign gene expression in mouse muscle", HUM MOL GENET, (1992), vol. 1, pages 363 - 369 |