EP1535052 - METHODS FOR VERIFYING FLUID MOVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics, Inc. 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, CA 94608 / US | [2007/04] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states CHIRON CORPORATION 4560 Horton Street Emeryville California 94608-2916 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAGWINSKI, Willy 26922 Brahms Drive Westlake, OH 44145 / US | 02 /
HARRINGTON, Charles 835 Donovan Court Davis, CA 95616-4819 / US | 03 /
PHELPS, Bruce 118 La Encinal Court Clayton, CA 94517 / US | [2006/35] |
Former [2005/22] | 01 /
LAGWINSKI, Willy 26922 Brahms Drive Westlake, OH 44145 / US | ||
02 /
HARRINGTON, Charles 819 Wall Street Livermore, CA 94550 / US | |||
03 /
PHELPS, Bruce 118 La Encinal Court Clayton, CA 94517 / US | Representative(s) | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | ||
Former [2005/22] | Hallybone, Huw George, et al Carpmaels and Ransford, 43-45 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 03749409.3 | 05.09.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003US27715 | Priority number, date | US20020408296P | 06.09.2002 Original published format: US 408296 P | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004023118 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1535052 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/76 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
G01N21/6489 (EP,US);
G01N21/76 (KR);
B82Y15/00 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
B82Y99/00 (KR);
Y10S977/70 (EP,US);
Y10S977/841 (EP,US);
Y10S977/852 (EP,US);
Y10S977/901 (EP,US);
Y10S977/962 (EP,US);
Y10T436/11 (EP,US);
Y10T436/118339 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25625 (EP,US);
Y10T436/2575 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERIFIZIEREN EINER FLUIDBEWEGUNG | [2005/22] | English: | METHODS FOR VERIFYING FLUID MOVEMENT | [2005/22] | French: | PROCEDES DE VERIFICATION D'UN MOUVEMENT DE FLUIDE | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.03.2005 | Examination requested [2008/27] | 19.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5120661 (BAKER GARY L [US], et al) [Y] 31 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0703451 (NALCO CHEMICAL CO [US]) [Y] 31 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0959140 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraph [0022] *; | [Y] - HENRY C M, "Bar Coding biomolecules/QUANTUM-DOT-TAGGED POLYMERIC MICROBEADS PROVIDE MULTIPLEXED OPTICAL CODING", CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING NEWS, ACS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20010716), vol. 79, no. 29, ISSN 0009-2347, pages 24 - 25, XP002962360 [Y] 1-17,31 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5504014 (LINDSAY ALEXANDER D [US], et al); | [AE]US2003213503 (PRICE KENNETH NATHAN [US], et al); | [A]US6274323 (BRUCHEZ MARCEL P [US], et al); | [A]US6037180 (YORKGITIS ELAINE M [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0703451 | US5120661 | EP0959140 | - MARVEL ET AL., "House's Modern Synthetic Reactions", TEXT ORGANIC SYNTHESIS, vol. 1 | - HENRY, C. M., CHEMICAL AND ENGINEERING NEWS, (2001), vol. 79, no. 29, pages 24 - 25 |