EP1545325 - ENDOSCOPIC BAND LIGATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONMED Endoscopic Technologies, Inc. 129 Concord Road, Building 3 Billerica, MA 01821 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/49] | For all designated states CONMED Endoscopic Technologies, Inc. 129 Concord Road Building 3 Billerica MA 01821 / US | ||
Former [2005/26] | For all designated states C.R. BARD, INC. 730 Central Avenue Murray Hill New Jersey 07974 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZIRPS, Christopher, T. 19 Briar Hill Road Sharon, MA 02067 / US | 02 /
MEMBRINO, Timothy, R. 19 Henley Road Acton, MA 01720 / US | 03 /
REED, Scott 25 Walnut Street Monroe, CT 06468 / US | 04 /
CORRAO, Ernest, Jr. 6 Canaan Drive Bethel, CT 06801 / US | 05 /
MAGUIRE, Stephen 8 Christmas Tree Hill Road Huntington, CT 06484 / US | 06 /
MEARS, Eric P.O. Box 6 South Bristol, ME 04568 / US | 07 /
COPELAND, David, J. 31 Parkway Cresant Milton, MA 02186 / US | 08 /
MURPHY, John, S. 2 Judith Drive North Reading, MA 01864 / US | 09 /
LOGAN, Joseph 10 Mallett Drive Trumbull, CT 06611 / US | 10 /
SILVA, Sean, J. 45 Ash Hill Road Reading, MA 01867 / US | 11 /
YARDAN, Steven, J. 210 Stony Creek Road Branford, CT 06405 / US | [2005/26] | Representative(s) | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/35] | Vuillermoz, Bruno, et al Cabinet Laurent & Charras "Le Contemporain" 50, Chemin de la Bruyère 69574 Dardilly Cédex / FR | ||
Former [2005/26] | Bowman, Paul Alan Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 03749418.4 | 05.09.2003 | [2005/26] | WO2003US27733 | Priority number, date | US20020408555P | 06.09.2002 Original published format: US 408555 P | [2005/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004021865 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1545325 | Date: | 29.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.09.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61B17/04 | [2008/08] | CPC: |
A61B17/12013 (EP,US);
A61B1/00087 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00296 (EP,US);
A61B2017/12018 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2005/26] | A61B17/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/26] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENDOSKOPISCHER BANDLIGATOR | [2005/26] | English: | ENDOSCOPIC BAND LIGATOR | [2005/26] | French: | LIGATEUR DE BANDE ENDOSCOPIQUE | [2005/26] | Entry into regional phase | 07.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 07.03.2005 | Search fee paid | 07.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 07.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/26] | 01.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 09.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.07.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5788715 (WATSON JR THOMAS E [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 8 - column 5, line 35; figures 1-3 *; | [DA]US6436108 (MEARS ERIC L [US]) [DA] 1-3* abstract *; | [E]WO2004021868 (BARD INC C R [US]) [E] 1-3 * abstract * * page 8, lines 7-17 * | International search | [A]US4788966 (YOON INBAE [US]); | [A]US5788715 (WATSON JR THOMAS E [US], et al); | [A]US4226239 (POLK TODD J, et al) |