EP1551401 - MANNITOL FORMULATION FOR INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEBUSI, Laura, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
KARABORNI, Sami 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
MATUSZEWSKA, Bozena, K. 1604 Claudia Way, North Wales Pennsylvania 19454 / US | 04 /
PROCOPIO, Adam, T. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
XU, Wei 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
YANG, Chia-Yi 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | [2006/25] |
Former [2005/28] | 01 /
DEBUSI, Laura, A. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | ||
02 /
KARABORNI, Sami 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | |||
03 /
MATUSZEWSKA, Bozena, K. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | |||
04 /
PROCOPIO, Adam, T. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | |||
05 /
XU, Wei 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | |||
06 /
YANG, Chia-Yi 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, NJ 07065-0907 / US | Representative(s) | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited European Patent Department Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2005/28] | Buchan, Gavin MacNicol Merck & Co., Inc., European Patent Department, Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 03749687.4 | 16.09.2003 | [2005/28] | WO2003US28959 | Priority number, date | US20020412262P | 20.09.2002 Original published format: US 412262 P | [2005/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004026233 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1551401 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.05.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/44 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K9/2054 (EP,US);
A61P19/00 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61K9/2013 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | 20.04.2005 | LV | 20.04.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MANNITOL-FORMULIERUNG F R EINEN INTEGRIN-REZEPTOR-ANTAGONISTEN | [2005/28] | English: | MANNITOL FORMULATION FOR INTEGRIN RECEPTOR ANTAGONIST | [2005/28] | French: | FORMULATION DE MANNITOL DESTINEE A UN ANTAGONISTE DE RECEPTEUR D'INTEGRINE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2005 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 20.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/50] | 28.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0134602 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * claims 21,22 * * page 19; compounds 3-4 * * page 38; compounds 3-4 ** page 41; compounds 3-4 * | International search | [A]US6017926 (ASKEW BEN C [US], et al); | [A]US6268378 (DUGGAN MARK E [US], et al) |