20.09.2013 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
12.10.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
26.09.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.09.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.04.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2012 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
14.11.2011 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.06.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
26.04.2011 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2010 |
First examination report |
|
13.12.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
18.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.03.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.07.2005 |
Change - designated states |
published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
22.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.01.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
31.12.2004 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] |
31.12.2004 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 16.02.2005 [2005/07] |
22.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.11.2004 |
Deletion: Fee payment for extension state |
|
30.11.2004 |
Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state |
|
02.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.08.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.06.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.03.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.02.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
28.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.11.2003 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|