EP1509102 - RELEASABLY ATTACHABLE GRIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ruana, Bruce M. 1781 Bitterbrush Court Gardnerville, NV 89410 / US | [2005/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2005/09] | Representative(s) | Leeming, John Gerard J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/09] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 03750133.5 | 13.05.2003 | [2005/09] | WO2003US15355 | Priority number, date | US20020145566 | 13.05.2002 Original published format: US 145566 | [2005/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO03094780 | Date: | 20.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1509102 | Date: | 02.03.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.11.2003 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A45C13/28, E04F11/18, B32B7/02 | [2006/06] | CPC: |
E04F11/18 (EP);
B32B5/04 (EP);
G08B5/36 (EP);
G08B7/06 (EP);
A62B3/00 (EP);
E04F2011/1872 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2005/09] | A45C13/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LÖSBAR ANBRINGBARER GRIFF | [2005/09] | English: | RELEASABLY ATTACHABLE GRIP | [2005/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PREHENSION A FIXATION LIBERABLE | [2005/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2004 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2004 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2004 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2004 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2003 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.2004 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2004 | Examination requested [2005/09] | 04.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2007 | 31.05.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3848480 (OSEROFF H, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 46 - line 57 * * column 2, line 4 - line 10 * * column 5, line 35 - line 42 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]GB2157470 (SMITH JOHN ERIC) [A] 1,4 * page 1, line 72 - line 123; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4941369 (SPECHT BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1,7* column 1, line 67 - column 2, line 52; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9625729 (RIJLAARSDAM DESIGN HOLDING B V [NL], et al) [A] 1,4,5,7 * page 5, line 26 - page 7, line 6 * * page 9, line 29 - page 10, line 29 * * figures 1-7B *; | [A]US5775016 (CHIEN TSENG-LU [TW]) [A] 1-3 * column 2, line 41 - line 49 * * column 6, line 15 - line 30 * * figures 1-3,9,11,15A-15G *; | [A]US6372323 (KOBE JAMES J [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 4, line 66 - column 6, line 14; figures 1,3-8 * | International search | [X]US3848480 (OSEROFF H, et al); | [X]US4941369 (SPECHT BRIAN [US], et al); | [Y]US4416166 (JANNARD JAMES H [US], et al); | [Y]US5390766 (MARTIN ADOLF H [US]) | by applicant | US5584096 | US5190267 | US6062519 | US5775756 |