EP1585612 - METHOD FOR JOINING TWO METAL SHEETS RESPECTIVELY CONSISTING OF AN ALUMINIUM MATERIAL AND AN IRON OR TITANIUM MATERIAL BY MEANS OF A BRAZE WELDING JOINT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voestalpine Stahl GmbH Voest-Alpine-Strasse 3 4020 Linz / AT | [2005/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMARANZER, Christian Römergasse 9 A-4072 Alkoven / AT | 02 /
STELLNBERGER, Karl-Heinz Kirchholz 3 A-4491 Niederneukirchen / AT | 03 /
LEITNER, Alois Bach 109 A-4852 Weyregg am Attersee / AT | [2005/42] | Representative(s) | Hübscher, Helmut Patentanwaltskanzlei Hübscher Postfach 411 4010 Linz / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/42] | Hübscher, Helmut Spittelwiese 7 4020 Linz / AT | Application number, filing date | 03750140.0 | 06.10.2003 | [2005/42] | WO2003AT00298 | Priority number, date | AT20020001514 | 07.10.2002 Original published format: AT 15142002 | AT20030000773 | 19.05.2003 Original published format: AT 7732003 | [2005/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004030856 | Date: | 15.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1585612 | Date: | 19.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1585612 | Date: | 17.05.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B23K9/23, B23K1/19 | [2005/42] | CPC: |
B23K1/0008 (EP,US);
B23K9/23 (KR);
B23K1/19 (EP,KR,US);
B23K2103/02 (EP,US);
B23K2103/10 (EP,US);
B23K2103/14 (EP,US);
B23K2103/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FÜGEN ZWEIER BLECHE EINERSEITS AUS EINEM ALUMINIUMWERKSTOFF UND ANDERSEITS AUS EINEM EISEN- ODER TITANWERKSTOFF DURCH EINE SCHWEISS-LÖTVERBINDUNG | [2005/42] | English: | METHOD FOR JOINING TWO METAL SHEETS RESPECTIVELY CONSISTING OF AN ALUMINIUM MATERIAL AND AN IRON OR TITANIUM MATERIAL BY MEANS OF A BRAZE WELDING JOINT | [2005/42] | French: | PROCEDE POUR JOINDRE PAR SOUDOBRASAGE DEUX TOLES COMPOSEES, D'UNE PART, D'UN MATERIAU A BASE D'ALUMINIUM ET, D'AUTRE PART, D'UN MATERIAU A BASE DE FER OU DE TITANE | [2005/42] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2005 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.06.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 28.06.2005 | Examination requested [2005/42] | 01.12.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.06.2005 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | 27.06.2005 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 27.06.2005 | M01   Fee paid on   27.06.2005 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.05.2006 | EE | 17.05.2006 | FI | 17.05.2006 | IE | 17.05.2006 | RO | 17.05.2006 | SI | 17.05.2006 | TR | 17.05.2006 | BG | 17.08.2006 | DK | 17.08.2006 | SE | 17.08.2006 | GR | 18.08.2006 | LU | 06.10.2006 | PT | 17.10.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | MC | 31.10.2006 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/03] | CY | 17.05.2006 | |
EE | 17.05.2006 | ||
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
TR | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
LU | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | EE | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
TR | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
LU | 06.10.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | EE | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
BG | 17.08.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 17.05.2006 | |
FI | 17.05.2006 | ||
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
GR | 18.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
IT | 17.05.2006 | ||
RO | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
MC | 31.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
IE | 17.05.2006 | ||
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
DK | 17.08.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
PT | 17.10.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SI | 17.05.2006 | ||
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 17.05.2006 | |
SE | 17.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 17.08.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS58100978 ; | [A]JP2000015448 ; | [A]GB964743 (JOSEF BERTELS) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]US3341680 (RAFAILOVICH RJABOV VLADIMIR, et al) [AD] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE10017453 (AUDI AG [DE]) [AD] 1-7* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830908), vol. 007, no. 203, Database accession no. (M - 241), & JP58100978 A 19830615 (MITSUBISHI JUKOGYO KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000015448 A 20000118 (NIPPON YUTEKU KK) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |