EP1552161 - IMPELLER FOR A PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bitter Engineering & Systemtechnik GmbH Burgstallstrasse 13 4523 Neuzeug / AT | [2005/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHOBER, Martin Ramsau 33 A-4591 Molln / AT | 02 /
FEICHTINGER, Gerald Diepersdorf 72 A-4552 Wartberg / AT | [2005/28] | Representative(s) | Babeluk, Michael Patentanwalt Florianigasse 26/3 1080 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/28] | Babeluk, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt, Mariahilfer Gürtel 39/17 1150 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 03750145.9 | 16.10.2003 | [2007/01] | WO2003AT00312 | Priority number, date | AT20020001578 | 17.10.2002 Original published format: AT 15782002 | [2005/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004036054 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1552161 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1552161 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/25] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1552161 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04D29/22 | [2005/28] | CPC: |
F04D29/2222 (EP,US);
B29L2031/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LAUFRAD F R EINE PUMPE | [2005/28] | English: | IMPELLER FOR A PUMP | [2005/28] | French: | ROTOR DE POMPE | [2005/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/28] | 28.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | IE | 21.06.2006 | NL | 21.06.2006 | RO | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | MC | 30.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | SE | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | ES | 02.10.2006 | LU | 30.10.2006 | BE | 31.10.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | HU | 22.12.2006 | [2009/39] |
Former [2009/03] | CY | 21.06.2006 | |
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
TR | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
LU | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
HU | 22.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/37] | EE | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
TR | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
LU | 30.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
HU | 22.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/32] | EE | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
HU | 22.12.2006 | ||
Former [2008/31] | EE | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/28] | EE | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/50] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/41] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/27] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
IE | 21.06.2006 | ||
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/19] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
NL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/14] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
ES | 02.10.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/07] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
MC | 30.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | FI | 21.06.2006 | |
SE | 21.09.2006 | ||
Former [2006/49] | SE | 21.09.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5209641 (HOEGLUND RONNY [SE], et al) [X] 1,14 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0760428 (FUJIKOKI CORP [JP]) [X] 1,14* the whole document *; | [X]US6139274 (HEER SIEGFRIED [AT]) [X] 1-16 * the whole document * |