EP1561033 - SUCTION VALVE FOR A SMALL HERMETIC COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WHIRLPOOL S.A. Avenida das Nações Unidas 12995 32 andar - Brooklin Novo 04578-000 São Paulo SP / BR | [2006/34] |
Former [2005/32] | For all designated states EMPRESA BRASILEIRA DE COMPRESSORES S/A - EMBRACO Rua Rui Barbosa 1020 89219-901 Joinville, SC / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BORTOLI, Marcos, Giovani Dropa Rua Borba Gato, 700 - Apt. 404 - Bloco A 89203-020 Joinville - SC / BR | 02 /
POSSAMAI, Fabricio, Caldeira Rua Jaguaruna, 207 - Apt. 602 89201-450 Joinville - SC / BR | 03 /
LILIE, Dietmar, Erich, Bernhard Rua Orestes Guimaraes, 804 89204-060 JOINVILLE - SC / BR | 04 /
TODESCAT, Márcio, Luiz Rua Alberto Schweitzer, 54 - 89217-160 Joinville - SC / BR | [2009/02] |
Former [2005/32] | 01 /
BORTOLI, Marcos, Giovani Dropa Rua Borba Gato, 700 - Apt. 404 - Bloco A 89203-020 Joinville - SC / BR | ||
02 /
POSSAMAI, Fabricio, Caldeira Rua Jaguaruna, 207 - Apt. 602 89201-450 Joinville - SC / BR | |||
03 /
LILIE, Dietmar, Erich, Bernhard Rua Orestes Guimar es, 804 89204-060 JOINVILLE - SC / BR | |||
04 /
TODESCAT, Márcio, Luiz Rua Alberto Schweitzer, 54 - 89217-160 Joinville - SC / BR | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner mbB Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Geyer, Fehners & Partner Patentanwälte Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2005/32] | Geyer, Werner, Dr.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Geyer, Fehners & Partner Perhamerstrasse 31 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03750177.2 | 08.10.2003 | [2005/39] | WO2003BR00145 | Priority number, date | BR20020204413 | 09.10.2002 Original published format: BR 0204413 | [2005/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004033907 | Date: | 22.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1561033 | Date: | 10.08.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1561033 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F04B39/10 | [2005/32] | CPC: |
F16K15/16 (EP,KR,US);
F04B39/1073 (EP,KR,US);
F04B39/1066 (KR);
F25B31/00 (KR);
F25B41/20 (KR);
F05B2210/12 (KR);
F05B2210/14 (KR);
Y10S251/00 (KR);
Y10S417/902 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2006/05] |
Former [2005/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAUGVENTIL FÜR EINEN KLEINEN HERMETISCHEN VERDICHTER | [2005/32] | English: | SUCTION VALVE FOR A SMALL HERMETIC COMPRESSOR | [2005/32] | French: | SOUPAPE D'ASPIRATION POUR PETIT COMPRESSEUR HERMETIQUE | [2005/32] | Entry into regional phase | 01.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 01.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.05.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/32] | 25.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE1093629 (WILLY HIRCHE) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE1600739 (DANFOSS AS) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]GB1336676 (HOERBIGER VENTILWERKE AG) [X] 1,2,5 * the whole document *; | [X]US4764091 (IKEDA HAYATO [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8 * the whole document * * column 6, lines 50-64 * |