EP1539959 - GHRH ANALOGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.2010 [2010/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre Hospitalier de l'Université de Montréal (CHUM) Pavillon Masson 3840, rue Saint-Urbain Bureau 8-107A Montréal Québec H2W 1T8 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states Centre Hospitalier de l'Université de Montréal (CHUM) Pavillon Masson 3840, rue Saint-Urbain Bureau 8-107A Montréal, Québec H2W 1T8 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUDREAU, Pierrette 9123, boul. Rivard Brossard, Québec J4X 1V5 / CA | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Jörg Peter, et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | Hoffmann, Jörg Peter, Dr. Ing., et al Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 03750194.7 | 17.09.2003 | [2005/24] | WO2003CA01418 | Priority number, date | US20020411340P | 18.09.2002 Original published format: US 411340 P | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004027064 | Date: | 01.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1539959 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/16, C07K14/60, A61K38/25 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
A61K38/25 (KR);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P15/14 (EP);
A61P17/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P5/10 (EP);
C07K14/60 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GHRH-ANALOGE | [2005/24] | English: | GHRH ANALOGUES | [2005/24] | French: | ANALOGUES DE GHRH | [2005/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/24] | 19.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/39] | 11.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XD]US5854216 (GAUDREAU PIERRETTE [CA]) [XD] 1-16 * columns 27-28; tables 11,12 * * the whole document * |