EP1553835 - PESTICIDAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.2010 [2010/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2005/29] | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier-Genève / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McGEE, Thomas 34 Village Gate Way Nyack, NY 10960 / US | 02 /
SGARAMELLA, Richard, P. 1036 Garden Street Hoboken, NJ 07030 / US | 03 /
JOHNSON, Gary, M. 30 Allen Street Allendale, NJ 07401 / US | [2005/29] | Representative(s) | Global Patents Givaudan International SA Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Givaudan Patents Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dubendorf / CH | ||
Former [2005/29] | McStea, John Anthony, et al Givaudan Schweiz AG, Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Duebendorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 03750225.9 | 16.10.2003 | [2005/29] | WO2003CH00677 | Priority number, date | US20020419892P | 21.10.2002 Original published format: US 419892 P | [2005/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004034791 | Date: | 29.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1553835 | Date: | 20.07.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01N65/00, A01N25/28, A01N25/12 | [2005/29] | CPC: |
A01N65/00 (EP,US);
A01N25/08 (EP,US);
A01N25/12 (EP,US);
A01N25/28 (EP,US);
A01N61/02 (EP,US);
A01N63/10 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/08, A01N49/00, A01N65/42 (US,EP);
A01N25/28, A01N25/18, A01N49/00, A01N65/42 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PESTIZIDE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2005/29] | English: | PESTICIDAL COMPOSITIONS | [2005/29] | French: | COMPOSITIONS PESTICIDES | [2005/29] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Examination requested [2005/29] | 01.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/46] | 09.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH0413607 ; | [X]JPH02221208 ; | [X]JPH0268364 ; | [XY]FR2570604 (PHARMEDIS SA [FR]) [X] 1,5-8,11 * page 1, lines 11-20,30-34 * * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 6; examples I-V *[Y] 9,10; | [XY]WO9428107 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-4,11 * page 3, line 24 - page 4, line 11 * * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 8 * * page 7, line 23 - page 8, line 9 * * page 10, line 36 - page 11, line 11; example I * [Y] 9,10; | [X]WO9600056 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [X] 1,5-7,9-11 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 4, paragraph 7 - page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 6, paragraph 5 * * page 11, paragraphs 2-4 *; | [DXY]WO9917871 (GIVAUDAN ROURE INT [CH], et al) [DX] 1,5-8,11 * page 1, line 2 - page 2, line 12 * * page 6, lines 4-22 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 17; examples 1-3 * [Y] 9,10; | [X]DE19824680 (GREWE HELMUT F [DE]) [X] 1,9-11 * column 2, lines 7-24,40-44 * * column 3, lines 1-25 *; | [XY]EP1061124 (GIVAUDAN SA [CH]) [X] 1-4,11 * paragraphs [0013] , [0017] - [0019] - [0023] - [0027]; examples 1,6,7 * [Y] 9,10; | [DY]WO0110214 (ECOSMART TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [DY] 9,10 * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * page 7, paragraph 4 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 9, paragraph 1 *; | [XY]WO0145835 (BALCHEM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-4,11 * page 4, lines 9-12 * * page 5, lines 27-29 * * page 6, lines 4-20 * * page 7, lines 6-30; example 2 * [Y] 9,10; | [PX]WO03071871 (TERRA NOSTRA PRODUKTE MIT NATU [DE], et al) [PX] 1,5-11 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 3, paragraphs 2,3 * * page 4, line 24 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 2; claims 1,9 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 09, Database accession no. 1992-069406, XP002266894 & JPH0413607 A 19920117 (ISHIBASHI S) [X] 1-4,9-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 41, Database accession no. 1990-310176, XP002266895 & JPH02221208 A 19900904 (TAIYO KAGAKU KK) [X] 1-3,9-11 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1990, no. 16, Database accession no. 1990-119116, XP002266896 & JPH0268364 A 19900307 (NIPPON TERPENE KAGAKU KK) [X] 1,5-11 * abstract * |