EP1529053 - MACROLIDE COMPOUNDS ENDOWED WITH ANTIINFLAMMATORY ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zambon S.p.A. Via Lillo del Duca, 10 20091 Bresso MI / IT | [2007/16] |
Former [2005/19] | For all designated states ZAMBON GROUP S.p.A. Via della Chimica, 9 36100 Vicenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAPOLETANO, Mauro Via Venini, 37 I-20127 Milano / IT | 02 /
MORIGGI, Ermanno Largo Crivelli 5 I-21052 Busto Arsizio / IT | 03 /
MEREU, Andrea Via E. Montale, 10 I-22070 Grandate (CO) / IT | 04 /
ORNAGHI, Fernando Via Menaggio, 80/E I-22010 Carlazzo / IT | 05 /
MORAZZONI, Gabriele Via Fagnana, 29/B 22078 Turate (CO) / IT | 06 /
LONGONI, Roberto Piazza Sant'Anna, 11 I-22070 Locate Varesino / IT | 07 /
RIVA, Carlo Via Fugazza, 22 I-22044 Inverigo / IT | 08 /
PACCHETTI, Luciano Piazza Sant'Ana, 11 I-22070 Locate Varesino / IT | 09 /
PELLACINI, Franco Via G. Balla, 14 I-20151 Milano / IT | [2006/30] |
Former [2006/28] | 01 /
NAPOLETANO, Mauro Via Venini, 37 I-20127 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
MORIGGI, Ermanno Largo Crivelli 5 I-21052 Busto Arsizio / IT | |||
03 /
MEREU, Andrea Via E. Montale, 10 I-22070 Grandate (CO) / IT | |||
04 /
ORNAGHI, Fernando Via Menaggio, 80/E I-22010 Carlazzo / IT | |||
05 /
MORAZZONI, Gabriele Via Labriola, 12 I-20020 Lainate / IT | |||
06 /
LONGONI, Roberto Piazza Sant'Anna, 11 I-22070 Locate Varesino / IT | |||
07 /
RIVA, Carlo Via Fugazza, 22 I-22044 Inverigo / IT | |||
08 /
PACCHETTI, Luciano Piazza Sant'Ana, 11 I-22070 Locate Varesino / IT | |||
09 /
PELLACINI, Franco Via G. Balla, 14 I-20151 Milano / IT | |||
Former [2005/19] | 01 /
NAPOLETANO, Mauro Via Venini, 37 I-20127 Milano / IT | ||
02 /
MORIGGI, Ermanno Largo Crivelli 5 I-21052 Busto Arsizio / IT | |||
03 /
MEREU, Andrea Via Fratelli Recchi, 9 I-22100 Como / IT | |||
04 /
ORNAGHI, Fernando Via Menaggio, 80/E I-22010 Carlazzo / IT | |||
05 /
MORAZZONI, Gabriele Via Labriola, 12 I-20020 Lainate / IT | |||
06 /
LONGONI, Roberto Piazza Sant'Anna, 11 I-22070 Locate Varesino / IT | |||
07 /
RIVA, Carlo Via Fugazza, 22 I-22044 Inverigo / IT | |||
08 /
PACCHETTI, Luciano Piazza Sant'Ana, 11 I-22070 Locate Varesino / IT | |||
09 /
PELLACINI, Franco Via G. Balla, 14 I-20151 Milano / IT | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Pirelli 19 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2005/19] | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l., Via Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 03750405.7 | 29.07.2003 | [2005/19] | WO2003EP08448 | Priority number, date | IT2002MI01726 | 01.08.2002 Original published format: IT MI20021726 | [2010/45] |
Former [2005/19] | IT2002MI00176 | 01.08.2002 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004013153 | Date: | 12.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1529053 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.02.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1529053 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08, A61K31/7048, A61P29/00 | [2005/19] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/19] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MAKROLIDVERBINDUNGEN MIT ANTIINFLAMMATORISCHER WIRKUNG | [2005/19] | English: | MACROLIDE COMPOUNDS ENDOWED WITH ANTIINFLAMMATORY ACTIVITY | [2005/19] | French: | COMPOSES DE MACROLIDES AYANT UNE ACTIVITE ANTI-INFLAMMATOIRE | [2005/19] | Entry into regional phase | 23.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 23.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/19] | 25.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10180640.4 / EP2258708 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | RO | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SI | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | LU | 29.07.2011 | MC | 31.07.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
LU | 29.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
LU | 29.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.07.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
RO | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SI | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3923784 (KIERSTEAD RICHARD W, et al) [X] 1-3,10-17,19 * column 5 - column 6 *; | [X]US4743593 (HUNT ERIC [GB]) [X] 20* claim 25; column 9 *; | [X]EP0682038 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-3,10-17,19 * page 4 *; | [X]FR2735694 (ROUSSEL UCLAF [FR]) [X] 1-3,10-32 * the whole document *; | [X]US5969161 (BONNET ALAIN [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,10-17,19 * column 5 *; | [A]WO0042055 (ZAMBON SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,30 * the whole document *; | [X]JP2001181294 (HOKURIKU PHARMACEUTICAL) [X] 1-19 * page 34 structure II pages 39,41,49,57 * |