EP1534845 - GENERATION OF RECOMBINANT INFLUENZA VIRUS USING BACULOVIRUS DELIVERY VECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.07.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.08.2006 [2006/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polymun Scientific Immunbiologische Forschung GmbH Nussdorfer Lände 11 1190 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | For all designated states Polymun Scientific Immunbiologische Forschung GmbH Nussdorfer Lände 11 1190 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRABHERR, Reingard Ludwig-Kaiser-Strasse 11 A-3021 Pressbaum / AT | 02 /
EGOROV, Andrej Leipziger Strasse 58/8 A-1200 Vienna / AU | 03 /
POOMPUTSA, Kanokwan 825/604 Pracha-uthit 58/1, Moo 1, Toongkhru Bangkok, 10140 / TH | 04 /
ERNST, Wolfgang Hauptstrasse 6 A-2486 Pottendorf / AT | 05 /
KITTEL, Christian Obere Donaustrasse 63/2/7 A-1020 Vienna / AT | 06 /
KATINGER, Hermann Heiligenstädterstrasse 127A/7/8 A-1190 Vienna / AT | [2005/22] | Representative(s) | Bogensberger, Burkhard Gebauer Bogensberger Patentanwälte AG Widagass 47 9487 Gamprin-Bendern / LI | [N/P] |
Former [2005/22] | Bogensberger, Burkhard, Dr. Bogensberger Patent- und Markenbüro, Austrasse 79 9490 Vaduz / LI | Application number, filing date | 03750434.7 | 23.08.2003 | [2005/22] | WO2003EP09375 | Priority number, date | US20020407695P | 04.09.2002 Original published format: US 407695 P | [2005/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004022760 | Date: | 18.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1534845 | Date: | 01.06.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/86 | [2005/22] | CPC: |
C12N15/86 (EP);
A61K39/12 (EP);
A61K39/145 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP,US);
C12N2710/14143 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG REKOMBINANTER INFLUENZA VIRUS MITTELS EINES BACULOVIRUS-EXPRESSIONSVEKTORS | [2005/22] | English: | GENERATION OF RECOMBINANT INFLUENZA VIRUS USING BACULOVIRUS DELIVERY VECTOR | [2005/22] | French: | OBTENTION DE VIRUS RECOMBINES DE LA GRIPPE A L'AIDE DE VECTEURS GENERATEURS DE BACULOVIRUS | [2005/22] | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.2005 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.01.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/22] | 01.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/34] | 06.04.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2005 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |